This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2023 at 06:16:01 (UTC).

John Yablonsky v. CDCR, et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 John Yablonsky filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against CDCR,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-56100

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN HENRY YABLONSKY

San Diego, CA 92179

Defendant / Appellees

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, Entity of the state of California

DANIEL PARAMO, Warden, R.J. Donovan (CDCR)

J. ROBLES, R.J. Donovan (CDCR) Librarian

POWELL, R.J. Donovan (CDCR) Librarian

BLAHNIK, R.J. Donovan (CDCR Sr. Librarian)

MARTINEZ, (CDCR) R.J. Donovan (Principal)

TICSCARNIA, (CDCR) Senior Librarian R.J. Donovan

MCGUIRE, (CDCR) Litigation Coordinator at R.J. Donovan

DOES, 1-10, Different employees within R.J. Donovan (titles and names unknown)

DOES, 11 Camoflage Doe

MONDET, Department of Corrections

SELF

OLIVARRIA

GARCIA

FULLER

PICKETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Henry Yablonsky

Attorney at RJDCF - R.J. DONOVAN CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

480 Alta Road

San Diego, CA 92179

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Shiran Zohar

Attorney at California Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, 10Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The November 21, 2022 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending October 12, 2022 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant must file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk will serve this order on the district court. [12626253] (CKP) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:01 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The November 21, 2022 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending October 12, 2022 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant must file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk will serve this order on the district court. [12626253] (CKP) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Lyndsay Rebecca Crenshaw in 22-56100 substituted by Attorney Shiran Zohar in 22-56100 [12617250] (NAC) [Entered: 12/23/2022 11:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Shiran Zohar (1300 I Street, Suite 125, P.O. Box 944255, Sacramento, CA 94244-2550) for Appellees Ticscarnia, McGuire, Martinez, Powell, J. Robles, CDCR and Blahnik. Substitution for Attorney Lyndsay Rebecca Crenshaw for Appellees Blahnik, CDCR, Martinez, McGuire, Daniel Paramo, Powell, J. Robles and Ticscarnia. Date of service: 12/23/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12617243] [22-56100] (Zohar, Shiran) [Entered: 12/23/2022 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant John Henry Yablonsky opening brief due 01/20/2023. Appellees Blahnik, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Does, Fuller, Garcia, Martinez, McGuire, Mondet, Olivarria, Daniel Paramo, Warden, Pickett, Powell, J. Robles, Self and Ticscarnia answering brief due 02/21/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12594944] (JMR) [Entered: 11/23/2022 11:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Self is a litigant

Latest cases where Pickett is a litigant

Latest cases where Fuller is a litigant

Latest cases where Garcia is a litigant