This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2021 at 11:55:40 (UTC).

John v. Central Loan Administration &

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 John filed an Other lawsuit against Central Loan Administration. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1368

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Denise N. Edwards-John

Jamaica, NY 11433

Garth Gary John

Jamaica, NY 11433

Defendant / Appellees

Citimortgage Inc.

Central Loan Administration & Reporting, (Cenlar)

FNC Insurance Agency

110/174 Holding LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Denise N. Edwards-John

109-52 174Th Street, Apt. 1

Jamaica, NY 11433

Garth Gary John

109-52 174Th Street, Apt. 1

Jamaica, NY 11433

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#12

8 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

8 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#5

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D-P, [ # 17 ], [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellants Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, FILED.[3128471] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [ # 15 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellants Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, FILED.[3128469] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Garth Gary John, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by US mail.[3128467] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Denise N. Edwards-John, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by US mail.[3128465] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Garth Gary John, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by US mail.[3128464] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Denise N. Edwards-John, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by US mail.[3128463] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [13], on behalf of Appellants Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, copy to pro se appellants, FILED.[3117382] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [11], on behalf of Appellant Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, copy to pro se appellants, FILED.[3117370] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellants Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, FILED. Service date 06/08/2021 by US mail.[3117364] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, FILED. Service date 06/08/2021 by US mail.[3117361] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/10/2021 11:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3116929] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/09/2021 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, district court receipt # 4653157673, FILED.[3116926] [21-1368] [Entered: 06/09/2021 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3109957] [21-1368] [Entered: 05/28/2021 09:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3109954] [21-1368] [Entered: 05/28/2021 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3109953] [21-1368] [Entered: 05/28/2021 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/13/2021, RECEIVED.[3109950] [21-1368] [Entered: 05/28/2021 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Denise N. Edwards-John and Garth Gary John, FILED. [3109942] [21-1368] [Entered: 05/28/2021 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant