This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2021 at 06:24:54 (UTC).

John Treanor, et al v. Micron Technology Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 John Treanor filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Micron Technology Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16641

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

In re: DYNAMIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY (DRAM) DIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOHN TREANOR

ONSHORE NETWORKS OF ILLINOIS, L.L.C., on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, DBA onShore Networks, L.L.C.

Defendant / Appellees

MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC.

MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

MICRON CONSUMER PRODUCTS GROUP, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.

SK HYNIX, INC., FKA Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.

SK HYNIX AMERICA, INC., FKA Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Adam Belsky Esquire

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C.

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Garrett D. Blanchfield Jr.

Attorney at Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

W1099 First National Bank Bldg., 332 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101

W. Joseph Bruckner

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN & HOLSTEIN P.L.L.P

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

William G. Caldes

Attorney at Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, P.C.

1818 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Elizabeth Tran Castillo

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

James Gerard Beebe Dallal Esquire

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Terry Gross Esquire

Attorney at Gross & Belsky P.C.

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

William H. London

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Road

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Douglas A. Millen Esquire

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Road

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Brian Murray Esquire

Attorney at Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

77 Water Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Mark Reinhardt

Attorney at REINHARDT WENDORF & BLANCHFIELD

E-1250 First National Bank Bldg., 332 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101

Randy Renick

Attorney at Hadsell Stormer Renick & Dai LLP

128 North Fair Oaks Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91103

Geoffrey Conrad Rushing

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

R. Alexander Saveri

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Eugene A. Spector Esquire

Attorney at Spector Roseman & Kodroff, P.C.

2001 Market Street, Suite 3420

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Cadio Zirpoli

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc.

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl, LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60604

Abram Ellis

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

900 G Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants onShore Networks of Illinois, L.L.C. and John Treanor Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/13/2021. [12255927] [21-16641] (Zapala, Adam) [Entered: 10/13/2021 02:40 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/03/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12263279] (VS) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:12 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12283973] (VS) [Entered: 11/10/2021 11:00 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12283973] (VS) [Entered: 11/10/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) COURT UPDATE: To correct the caption. Terminated Nathan P. Eimer for Micron Technology Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. and Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc. in 21-16641 [12283202] (TYL) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/03/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12263279] (VS) [Entered: 10/20/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/13/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12256414]. [21-16641] (AD) [Entered: 10/13/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants onShore Networks of Illinois, L.L.C. and John Treanor Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/13/2021. [12255927] [21-16641] (Zapala, Adam) [Entered: 10/13/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants John Treanor and onShore Networks of Illinois, L.L.C. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/13/2021. Appellants John Treanor and onShore Networks of Illinois, L.L.C. opening brief due 12/10/2021. Appellees Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc., SK Hynix America, Inc., SK Hynix, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. answering brief due 01/10/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12249525] (RT) [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON CONSUMER PRODUCTS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant