This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2021 at 05:41:52 (UTC).

John Thompson v. Aramark Correctional Services,, et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 John Thompson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Aramark Correctional Services. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3360

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN THOMPSON

Carlisle, IN 47838-0000

Defendant / Appellees

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC

DUSHAN ZATECKY, Superintendent

DUANE ALSIP

MICHAEL CONYERS

THOMAS M. RAMEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Thompson

Attorney at WABASH VALLEY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

P.O. Box 1111

Carlisle, IN 47838-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher D. Cody

Attorney at HUME SMITH GEDDES GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP

54 Monument Circle

Indianapolis, IN 46204-0000

Margo Tucker

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Rights Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) No attorney(s) added for Appellee Thomas M. Ramey, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7207095] [21-3360] (AG) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John Thompson by 01/03/2022. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 01/21/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 01/05/2022. [1] [7207088] [21-3360] (AG) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aramark Correctional Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Douglas Cody