This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/27/2022 at 06:09:30 (UTC).

John Taylor v. Warden

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 John Taylor filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10315

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JOHN TAYLOR

Helena, GA 31037

Respondent / Appellee

WARDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

John Taylor

Attorney at Telfair SP - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 549

Helena, GA 31037

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Michael Carr

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Clint Christopher Malcolm

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula Khristian Smith

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

Judgment doc#14

Open Document #3

HAB-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant John Taylor was filed on 10/28/2021. Docket Entry 13. [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:45 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant John Taylor. [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:18 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion Filed for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis

Open Restricted Document #2

IFP-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Notice of receipt: Petitioner's Response as to Appellant John Taylor.. [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clint Christopher Malcolm for Warden. [22-10315] (ECF: Clint Malcolm) [Entered: 03/09/2022 12:10 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant John Taylor. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9615722-1] [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:39 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Clint Christopher Malcolm for Appellee Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10315] (ECF: Clint Malcolm) [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:17 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Clint Christopher Malcolm for Appellee Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10315] (ECF: Clint Malcolm) [Entered: 03/11/2022 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Clint Christopher Malcolm for Warden. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant John Taylor. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9615722-1] [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Clint Christopher Malcolm for Warden. [22-10315] (ECF: Clint Malcolm) [Entered: 03/09/2022 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of filing Prisoner Financial Statement as to appellant. [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of receipt: Petitioner's Response as to Appellant John Taylor.. [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant John Taylor. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9603233-1] [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant John Taylor. [Entered: 02/22/2022 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant John Taylor was filed on 10/28/2021. Docket Entry 13. [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant John Taylor on 01/26/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Michael Carr