This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2021 at 05:50:42 (UTC).

John Stokes v. Robert Drummond, Ch13 Trustee

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 John Stokes filed an Other lawsuit against Robert Drummond, Ch13 Trustee. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1105

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

JOHN PATRICK STOKES

Bigfork, MT 59911

Debtor

In re: JOHN PATRICK STOKES

Appellee

ROBERT G. DRUMMOND, Chapter 13 Trustee

Po Box 1829

Great Falls, MT 59403

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

John Patrick Stokes

12887 Raven Way

Bigfork, MT 59911

Appellee Attorney

Robert G. Drummond

Attorney at Robert G. Drummond, Chapter 13 Trustee

Po Box 1829

Great Falls, MT 59403

 

Court Documents

#1

Bk.Ct. Transmittal Form - Re: Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Bk.Ct. Notice of Referral of Appeal

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #4

Copy: Bk.Ct. Order Dismissing Case (Bk.Ct. Docket Entry #70)

1 #5

Copy: Bk.Ct. Order Dismissing Case (Bk.Ct. Docket Entry #71)

#2

#3

4 #1

Opening Letter

4 #2

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

4 #3

BAP Rules

#4

BAP Administrative Order - Re: Efiling Documents

4 #5

Pro Se Guide with Forms

4 #6

BAP Order - Re: Appeals

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to all parties and Bankruptcy Court - RE: BAP Case number assigned: 21-1105. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VB) [Entered: 05/20/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Lafferty); Re: Necessary Number of Appeals. Single notice of appeal listing several orders filed at Bk.Ct.. Separate notice of appeal is required for each order on appeal. Five BAP Numbers assigned - Re: STOKES / BAP#'s: MT-21-1105, MT-21-1110, MT-21-1111, MT-21-1112 & MT-21-1113. By 06/03/2021, appellant must file at the Bk.Ct. a separate notice of appeal for BAP#'s: MT-21-1110, MT-21-1111, MT-21-1112 & MT-21-1113 which will relate back to the initial 04/27/2021 notice of appeal. (See Order for Details.) [21-1105, 21-1110, 21-1111, 21-1112, 21-1113] (VB) [Entered: 05/20/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received from Bankruptcy Court - - COPY: Appellant's Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. [21-1105, 21-1110, 21-1111, 21-1112, 21-1113] (VB) [Entered: 05/20/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received NOTICE OF APPEAL - Re: Appeal of 5 Orders - filed in Bankruptcy Court on 04/27/2021, Bk.Ct. Notice of Referral, Bk.Ct. Transmittal Form, Copy: Bk.Ct. Order Dismissing Case (Bk.Ct. Docket #70) & Copy: Bk.Ct. Order Dismissing Case (Bk.Ct. Docket #71). (VB) [Entered: 05/20/2021 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less