This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 06:10:58 (UTC).

John Smith v. USA

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 John Smith filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35011

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

JOHN ERIC SMITH

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Kelly L. Andersen Esquire

Attorney at Andersen Morse & Linthorst

1730 E. Mcandrews Road, Suite A

Medford, OR 97504

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Susanne Beth Luse

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Kelly A. Zusman

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Bradley Hinshelwood

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/18/2019, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11212109] (MS) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:29 PM]

#14

(#14) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 02/28/2019, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11192144] (BS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:39 PM]

#13

(#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/15/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 02/14/2019 ). [11179376] (BS) [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:49 AM]

#12

(#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CZ): Appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) to stay appellate proceedings is denied. [11173710] (AF) [Entered: 01/31/2019 08:42 AM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/14/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11171229] (BS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:46 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee John Eric Smith Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11154448] [19-35011] (Andersen, Kelly) [Entered: 01/15/2019 05:10 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11154303] [19-35011] (Luse, Susanne) [Entered: 01/15/2019 04:19 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant USA Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 01/11/2019. [11149906] [19-35011] (Luse, Susanne) [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:28 AM]

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#1

Docketing Letter

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/18/2019, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11212109] (MS) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 02/28/2019, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11192144] (BS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/15/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 02/14/2019 ). [11179376] (BS) [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CZ): Appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) to stay appellate proceedings is denied. [11173710] (AF) [Entered: 01/31/2019 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • (#11) Added attorney Bradley Hinshelwood for USA, in case 19-35011. [11172323] (CW) [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bradley Alan Hinshelwood for Appellant USA. Date of service: 01/30/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11172286] [19-35011] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/14/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11171229] (BS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • (#8) Attorney Billy J. Williams in 19-35011 substituted by Attorney Kelly A. Zusman in 19-35011 [11154596] (CW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • (#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11154548] (AD) [Entered: 01/15/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • (#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11154547] (AD) [Entered: 01/15/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee John Eric Smith Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11154448] [19-35011] (Andersen, Kelly) [Entered: 01/15/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11154303] [19-35011] (Luse, Susanne) [Entered: 01/15/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kelly A. Zusman for Appellant USA. Substitution for Attorney Billy J. Williams for Appellant USA. Date of service: 01/15/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11154160] [19-35011] (Zusman, Kelly) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant USA Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 01/11/2019. [11149906] [19-35011] (Luse, Susanne) [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/15/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/06/2019. Transcript due 03/08/2019. Appellant United States of America opening brief due 04/17/2019. Appellee John Eric Smith answering brief due 05/17/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11144522] (JMR) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less