This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2020 at 16:05:58 (UTC).

John Smith v. Deray McKesson, et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 John Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Deray McKesson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-30908

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PATRISSE CULLORS

JOHNETTA ELZIE

BLACK LIVES MATTER

OPAL TOMETI

BLACK LIVES MATTER NETWORK, INCORPORATED

DERAY MCKESSON

ALICIA GARZA

#BLACKLIVESMATTER

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN DOE SMITH, Officer, Through his Curator, John Doe Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

William P. Gibbens Esq.

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donna Unkel Grodner Esq.

Attorney at Grodner & Associates, A.P.L.C.

2223 Quail Run Drive

Baton Rouge, LA 70808-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Paper Copies Form

Open Document #2

Appellee/Respondent Brief Filed

Open Document #1

Paper Copies Form

Open Document #2

Jgmt as mdt

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

OPJDT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #2

Paper Copies Form

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/16/2018 for Appellant John Doe Smith. [17-30908] (MRB)

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William P. Gibbens, Esq. for Mr. Deray McKesson and Ms. Johnetta Elzie for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-30908] (William P. Gibbens )

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Donna Unkel Grodner, Esq. for Mr. John Doe Smith for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-30908] (Donna Unkel Grodner )

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8646846-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [17-30908] (CB)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [17-30908] (DDL) [Entered: 09/06/2018 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. Costs Taxed Against: Each party bear its own costs. [17-30908] (NFD) [Entered: 08/15/2018 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [17-30908 Affirmed] Judge: EGJ, Judge: JWE, Judge: DRW . Mandate issue date is 09/06/2018 [17-30908] (NFD) [Entered: 08/15/2018 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Paper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellant Mr. John Doe Smith in 17-30908 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-30908] (DLJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/20/2018 for Appellant John Doe Smith. [17-30908] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. John Doe Smith. Date of service: 02/12/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Grodner; Attorney for Appellee: Gibbens [17-30908] (Donna Unkel Grodner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellees Mr. Deray McKesson and Ms. Johnetta Elzie in 17-30908 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [17-30908] (DLJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Paper copies of Appellees' Brief filed by Appellees Mr. Deray McKesson and Ms. Johnetta Elzie in 17-30908 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-30908] (DLJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 02/12/2018, for Appellees Johnetta Elzie and Deray McKesson. [17-30908] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellees Ms. Johnetta Elzie and Mr. Deray McKesson. Date of service: 02/01/2018, via email - Attorney for Appellant: Grodner; Attorney for Appellee: Gibbens. [17-30908] (William P. Gibbens )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLEES' BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/12/2018, for Appellees Johnetta Elzie and Deray McKesson. Reply Brief due on 02/15/2018, for Appellant John Doe Smith. [17-30908] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF FILED by Ms. Johnetta Elzie and Mr. Deray McKesson. Date of service: 02/01/2018, via email - Attorney for Appellant: Grodner; Attorney for Appellee: Gibbens. [17-30908] (William P. Gibbens )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. John Doe Smith in 17-30908 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [17-30908] (DLJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/16/2018 for Appellant John Doe Smith. [17-30908] (MRB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [17-30908] (MRB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William P. Gibbens, Esq. for Mr. Deray McKesson and Ms. Johnetta Elzie for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-30908] (William P. Gibbens )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Donna Unkel Grodner for Appellant John Doe Smith in 17-30908 [17-30908] (CB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. John Doe Smith advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [17-30908] (MCS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. John Doe Smith for the Court to process. Date of service: 11/29/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Grodner; Attorney for Appellee: Gibbens; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Vinet. [17-30908] (Donna Unkel Grodner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Donna Unkel Grodner, Esq. for Mr. John Doe Smith for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-30908] (Donna Unkel Grodner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:17-CV-429. Electronic ROA due on 12/13/2017. [17-30908] (CB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8646846-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [17-30908] (CB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. John Doe Smith [17-30908] (RLL)

    Read MoreRead Less