This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:03:58 (UTC).

John Riepe v. United States

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 John Riepe filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1500

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Petitioner / Appellant

John Michael Riepe

Forrest City, AR 72336-9000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Melisa K. Zaehringer

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

310 U.S. Courthouse, 131 E. Fourth Street

Davenport, IA 52801-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

John Michael Riepe

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 9000

Forrest City, AR 72336-9000

Jeremy Gordon

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JEREMY GORDON, PLLC

Suite 106, 1848 Lone Star Road

Mansfield, TX 76063

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Melisa Zaehringer for Appellee United States of America w/service 03/14/2019 [4766850] [19-1500] (MKZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4765814] [19-1500] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:50 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4765831] [19-1500] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jeremy Gordon for Appellant Mr. John Michael Riepe w/service 03/21/2019 [4769128] [19-1500] (JG) [Entered: 03/21/2019 07:15 AM]

Open Document

APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. John Michael Riepe w/service 03/25/2019 [4770142] [19-1500] (JG) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:24 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 1/16/2019 and Judgment dated 1/17/2019. [4765830] [19-1500] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. John Michael Riepe w/service 03/25/2019 [4770142] [19-1500] (JG) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jeremy Gordon for Appellant Mr. John Michael Riepe w/service 03/21/2019 [4769128] [19-1500] (JG) [Entered: 03/21/2019 07:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Melisa Zaehringer for Appellee United States of America w/service 03/14/2019 [4766850] [19-1500] (MKZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4765831] [19-1500] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 1/16/2019 and Judgment dated 1/17/2019. [4765830] [19-1500] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4765814] [19-1500] (CMH) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.