This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/19/2020 at 06:10:45 (UTC).

John Reed v. RMBS REO Holdings, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 John Reed filed an Other lawsuit against RMBS REO Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1120

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

JOHN KENNETH REED

Debtor

In re: JOHN KENNETH REED

Appellees

RMBS REO HOLDINGS, LLC

OHO SAVINGS BANK

NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

OHIO SAVINGS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Douglas E. Klein Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Douglas E. Klein

3699 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Appellee Attorneys

Alexander K. Lee Esquire

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

4375 Jutland Drive

San Diego, CA 92117

Rebecca L. Wilson Esquire

Attorney at Kutak Rock Llp

5 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614-8595

Steven M. Dailey Esquire

Attorney at Kutak Rock Llp

5 Park Plaza

Irvine, CA 92614-8595

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Opening Letter

#2

form(s) sent

2 #3

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Douglas E. Klein, Esquire for Appellant John Kenneth Reed's motion to dismiss the case; 07/07/2020 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Dailey, Wilson; Attorney for Appellant: Klein; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lee. [20-1120] (DEK) [Entered: 07/07/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Attorney Steven M. Dailey, Esquire for Appellees Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., New York Community Bank and Ohio Savings Bank's motion to dismiss the case; 07/02/2020 served by: email - Attorney for Appellees: Dailey, Wilson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Klein; Attorney for Appellee: Lee. [20-1120] (SMD) [Entered: 07/02/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docket(#6) Party: Add Attorney(s) Steven M. Dailey for party(s) Appellee New York Community Bank Appellee Ohio Savings Bank Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., in case 20-1120. (PI) [Entered: 07/02/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Steven M. Dailey for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.; U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2017-PM13; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; Ohio Savings Bank; and New York Community Bancorp, Inc.; served on 07/02/2020 US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Klein; Attorney for Appellee: Lee; email - Attorney for Appellee: Wilson. [20-1120] (SMD) [Entered: 07/02/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant for lack of prosecution. Re: DOR, SOI and notice of transcript have not been filed. Response Due: 07/09/2020. cc: All parties. (PI) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER to appellant John Kenneth Reed. Copies to all parties. Appellant John Kenneth Reed's opening brief due 07/06/2020. (PI) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: CC-20-1120. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (PI) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 05/19/2020. (PI) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Savings Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where New York Community Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas E Klein