Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 07:00:10 (UTC).

John Nesse, et al v. Green Nature-Cycle, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 John Nesse filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2365

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund

Tammy Braastad, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund

John Nesse, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund and as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund

Fred Chase, as Trustees of the Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota

the Construction Laborers, Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota

Tim Mackey, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, and as Trustees of the Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and

Mark Ryan, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust

the Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund

Dave Borst, as Trustees of the Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust

the Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust

the Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund

Defendant / Appellant

Green Nature-Cycle, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Christy Elizabeth Lawrie

Attorney at MCGRANN & SHEA

2600 U.S. Bancorp Center, 800 Nicollet Mall

Minneapolis, MN 55402-7035

Carl S. Wosmek

Attorney at MCGRANN & SHEA

2600 U.S. Bancorp Center, 800 Nicollet Mall

Minneapolis, MN 55402-7035

Amy Lu Court

Attorney at MCGRANN & SHEA

2600 U.S. Bancorp Center, 800 Nicollet Mall

Minneapolis, MN 55402-7035

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Forrest Tahdooahnippah

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY

Suite 1500, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Forrest Kwahada Tahdooahnippah

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY

Suite 1500, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Shannon L. Bjorklund

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY

Suite 1500, 50 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. w/service 08/27/2020, Length: 9166 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Green Nature-Cycle, LLC due 09/01/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, John Nesse and Mark Ryan due on 09/28/2020 [4950219] [20-2365] (MDS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 04:35 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC , w/service 08/27/2020 [4949885] [20-2365] (MDS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:52 AM]

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Shannon L. Bjorklund for Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. [4949861] [20-2365] (MDS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:27 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Carl S. Wosmek for Appellees Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Mr. Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, Mr. John Nesse and Mr. Mark Ryan w/service 07/23/2020 [4937377] [20-2365] (CSW) [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:46 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Amy L. Court for Appellees Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Mr. Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund and Mr. John Nesse w/service 07/23/2020 [4937373] [20-2365] (ALC) [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:42 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Christy E. Lawrie for Appellees Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Mr. Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, Mr. John Nesse and Mr. Mark Ryan w/service 07/23/2020 [4937372] [20-2365] (CEL) [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:39 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/17/2020 [4934993] [20-2365] (FKT) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:34 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. - FOR CAL [4934981] [20-2365] (FKT) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:23 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Forrest Tahdooahnippah for Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC w/service 07/17/2020 [4934970] [20-2365] (FKT) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Shannon L. Bjorklund for Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC w/service 07/17/2020 [4934960] [20-2365] (SLB) [Entered: 07/17/2020 01:58 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/17/2020. Appendix due 08/26/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Green Nature-Cycle, LLC due 08/26/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4931154] [20-2365] (MMH) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:36 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 6/3/20 [4931150] [20-2365] (MMH) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:34 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4931130] [20-2365] (MMH) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:26 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4950219-2 ] filed by Green Nature-Cycle, LLC 10 paper copies received, w/Addendum attached. [4951491] [20-2365] (HAG) [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRECORD FILED - APLNT APPENDIX, 1 volumes. Comments: 1 VOLUME, 3 COPIES. [4950544] [20-2365] (BNW) [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. w/service 08/27/2020, Length: 9166 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Green Nature-Cycle, LLC due 09/01/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, John Nesse and Mark Ryan due on 09/28/2020 [4950219] [20-2365] (MDS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Green Nature-Cycle, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4949982] [20-2365]--[Edited 08/27/2020 by MDS - Reason: Edited to correct brief type] (SLB) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC , w/service 08/27/2020 [4949885] [20-2365] (MDS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Ms. Shannon L. Bjorklund for Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. [4949861] [20-2365] (MDS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4949741] [20-2365] (SLB) [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Green Nature-Cycle, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4949739] [20-2365] (SLB) [Entered: 08/26/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Carl S. Wosmek for Appellees Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Mr. Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, Mr. John Nesse and Mr. Mark Ryan w/service 07/23/2020 [4937377] [20-2365] (CSW) [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Amy L. Court for Appellees Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Mr. Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund and Mr. John Nesse w/service 07/23/2020 [4937373] [20-2365] (ALC) [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Christy E. Lawrie for Appellees Dave Borst, Tammy Braastad, Fred Chase, Construction Laborers, Mr. Tim Mackey, Minnesota Laborers Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Minnesota Laborers Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Laborers Pension Fund, Minnesota Laborers Vacation Fund, Mr. John Nesse and Mr. Mark Ryan w/service 07/23/2020 [4937372] [20-2365] (CEL) [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/17/2020 [4934993] [20-2365] (FKT) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC. - FOR CAL [4934981] [20-2365] (FKT) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Forrest Tahdooahnippah for Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC w/service 07/17/2020 [4934970] [20-2365] (FKT) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Shannon L. Bjorklund for Appellant Green Nature-Cycle, LLC w/service 07/17/2020 [4934960] [20-2365] (SLB) [Entered: 07/17/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/17/2020. Appendix due 08/26/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Green Nature-Cycle, LLC due 08/26/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4931154] [20-2365] (MMH) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 6/3/20 [4931150] [20-2365] (MMH) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4931130] [20-2365] (MMH) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Construction Laborers' Education, Training, and Apprenticeship Fund of Minnesota and North Dakota is a litigant