This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 06:08:16 (UTC).

John Hall, et al v. City of Chicago, et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 John Hall filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1347

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BONITA FRANKS

MCARTHUR HUBBARD

KIM PINDAK

JOHN HALL

VERNON DENNIS

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF CHICAGO, a municipal corporation

UNKNOWN, CHICAGO POLICE OFFICERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mark G. Weinberg

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARK G. WEINBERG

3612 N. Tripp Avenue

Chicago, IL 60641-3037

Adele D. Nicholas

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ADELE D. NICHOLAS

5707 W. Goodman Street

Chicago, IL 60630

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Myriam Z. Kasper

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CORPORATION COUNSEL

30 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

Justin A. Houppert

Attorney at CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT

30 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 04/29/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/29/2019 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/19/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. JB [6989464] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:52 PM]

#5

(#5) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 4 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 05/08/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/07/2019 for City of Chicago. and Unknown. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/28/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. CMD [5] [6989316] [19-1347]--[Edited 03/07/2019 by FP to reflect only one appellee was served.] (FP) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:08 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/07/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/22/2019 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/12/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. JB [6993927] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:27 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#3

(#3) Attorney Allan T. Slagel for City of Chicago in 19-1347 terminated and added Attorney(s) Myriam Z. Kasper for party(s) Appellee City of Chicago, in case 19-1347 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellee City of Chicago. [3] [6987347] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1347]--[Edited 02/27/2019 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:27 AM]

#6

(#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, March 28, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [6] [6989462] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:49 PM]

#1

Civil Case

#9

(#9) Appearance form filed by Attorney Justin A. Houppert for Appellee City of Chicago. [9] [6990852] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1347] [Edited 03/14/2019 by CAG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Houppert, Justin) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:28 PM]

#4

(#4) Motion filed by Appellants Kim Pindak, McArthur Hubbard, Vernon Dennis, John Hall and Bonita Franks to extend time to file Appellants' Opening Brief. [4] [6989199] [19-1347] (Weinberg, Mark) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:12 PM]

#8

(#8) AMENDED ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 05/08/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/07/2019 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/28/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. JB [6989657] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:49 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/07/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/22/2019 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/12/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. JB [6993927] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Appearance form filed by Attorney Justin A. Houppert for Appellee City of Chicago. [9] [6990852] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1347] [Edited 03/14/2019 by CAG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Houppert, Justin) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 05/08/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/07/2019 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/28/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. JB [6989657] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 04/29/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/29/2019 for City of Chicago. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/19/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. JB [6989464] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, March 28, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [6] [6989462] [19-1347] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 4 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 05/08/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/07/2019 for City of Chicago. and Unknown. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/28/2019 for Appellants Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak. CMD [5] [6989316] [19-1347]--[Edited 03/07/2019 by FP to reflect only one appellee was served.] (FP) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion filed by Appellants Kim Pindak, McArthur Hubbard, Vernon Dennis, John Hall and Bonita Franks to extend time to file Appellants' Opening Brief. [4] [6989199] [19-1347] (Weinberg, Mark) [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Attorney Allan T. Slagel for City of Chicago in 19-1347 terminated and added Attorney(s) Myriam Z. Kasper for party(s) Appellee City of Chicago, in case 19-1347 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellee City of Chicago. [3] [6987347] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1347]--[Edited 02/27/2019 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • (#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANT: George Gardner [2] [6987071] [19-1347] (AP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/12/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/08/2019 for Vernon Dennis, Bonita Franks, John Hall, McArthur Hubbard and Kim Pindak [1] [6987064] [19-1347] (AP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.