This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/06/2021 at 06:03:13 (UTC).

John Florendo, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 John Florendo filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16461

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOHN G. FLORENDO

DEBORAH P. FLORENDO

Defendant / Appellee

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as successor trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, as trustee for the holders of Sami II trust2006-AR7, mortgage pass-through certificates, series 2006-AR7, FKA Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John G. Florendo

Deborah P. Florendo

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Lachman

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. By October 7, 2021, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Jonathan Westen, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12234335] (AF) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:54 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [12250429] (OC) [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:57 AM]

#5

(#5) Streamlined request by Appellant John G. Florendo to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Deborah P. Florendo and John G. Florendo opening brief due 12/02/2021. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 01/03/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12268173] (JN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:40 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon motion. Attorney(s) Attorney Scott Lachman for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 11/03/2021. [12277369] [21-16461] (Lachman, Scott) [Entered: 11/03/2021 02:34 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon motion. Attorney(s) Attorney Scott Lachman for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 11/03/2021. [12277369] [21-16461] (Lachman, Scott) [Entered: 11/03/2021 02:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Streamlined request by Appellant John G. Florendo to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Deborah P. Florendo and John G. Florendo opening brief due 12/02/2021. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 01/03/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12268173] (JN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [12250429] (OC) [Entered: 10/07/2021 09:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) Deleted Incorrect Entry. [12249470] (BLS) [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. By October 7, 2021, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (Jonathan_Westen@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Jonathan Westen, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12234335] (AF) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Deborah P. Florendo and John G. Florendo opening brief due 11/02/2021. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 12/02/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12221331] (JBS) [Entered: 09/07/2021 10:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less