This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 06:04:59 (UTC).

John Fletcher v. Scott Harris

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 John Fletcher filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Scott Harris. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5132

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Scott Harris, Clerk of the United States Supreme Court, believed to be Scott Harris

Plaintiff / Appellant

John P. Fletcher

Buena Vista, CO 81211-2017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John P. Fletcher

Attorney at Buena Vista Correctional Facility

Po Box 2017

Buena Vista, CO 81211-2017

Warden (Buena Vista)

Attorney at Buena Vista Correctional Facility

Po Box 2017

Buena Vista, CO 81211-2017

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE [1795092] of inability to serve the party opposed filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1795089] to dispense with appendix filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:43 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1795088] filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:41 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1795078] filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,587. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:29 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1793390] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 19-5132: IFP] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1791472] filed referring motion ifp in district court [ # 1791445-2 ] to the district court for consideration., holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5132 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv169-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document

RECEIPT [1793420] received from for documents [ # 1786907-2 ] sent to Appellant John P. Fletcher [Per Warden:Unable to obtain ACKNOWLEDGMENT due to Institution rules - Material Given to John Fletcher by prison official] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:42 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [1791448] filed by John P. Fletcher [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:13 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CONSENT TO COLLECTION [1791447] filed by John P. Fletcher [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:12 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1791445] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document

LETTER [1786907] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1786906-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/07/2019. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1786906] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/08/2019. APPENDIX due 07/08/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:51 PM]

Open Document #5

Document Sent

Open Document #4

Form Sent

Open Document #2

Form Sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786890] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00169-UNA filed by John P. Fletcher. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5132. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:34 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1795092] of inability to serve the party opposed filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1795089] to dispense with appendix filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1795088] filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1795078] filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,587. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1793390] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 19-5132: IFP] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1791472] filed referring motion ifp in district court [ # 1791445-2 ] to the district court for consideration., holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5132 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv169-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT [1793420] received from for documents [ # 1786907-2 ] sent to Appellant John P. Fletcher [Per Warden:Unable to obtain ACKNOWLEDGMENT due to Institution rules - Material Given to John Fletcher by prison official] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [1791448] filed by John P. Fletcher [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CONSENT TO COLLECTION [1791447] filed by John P. Fletcher [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1791445] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1786907] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1786906-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/07/2019. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786906] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/08/2019. APPENDIX due 07/08/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786901] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/07/2019; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 06/07/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786890] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00169-UNA filed by John P. Fletcher. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5132. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.