This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 06:05:35 (UTC).

John Fitzgerald, et al v. FTA, et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 John Fitzgerald filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against FTA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5138

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

United States Department of the Interior

United States Fish and Wildlife Service

Federal Transit Administration

United States Department of Transportation

Plaintiff / Appellants

Christine Real de Azua

Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail

John M. Fitzgerald

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

State of Maryland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Kevin W. McArdle

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Nicholson Lawton

Attorney at Eubanks & Associates LLC

4115 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 210

Washington, DC 20016

Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire

Attorney at Meyer Glitzenstein & Eubanks LLP

4115 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 210

Washington, DC 20016

David W. Brown

Attorney at Knopf & Brown

401 E Jefferson Street, Suite 206

Rockville, MD 20850-0000

William Stewart Eubanks II

Attorney at Eubanks & Associates, LLC

2601 S. Lemay Avenue, Unit 7-240

Fort Collins, CO 80525

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Linda DeVuono

Attorney at Maryland Office of the Attorney General

100 S Charles Street, 7Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Albert M. Ferlo Jr.

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005-3960

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1793999] to establish briefing schedule filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua Length Certification: 333 words. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1792602] filed by DOI, DOT, FTA and FWS [Service Date: 06/13/2019 ] [19-5138] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:18 AM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1792541] submitted by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:15 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1792538] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:13 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1792537] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:11 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1792535] filed by William N. Lawton and co-counsel William S. Eubanks II on behalf of Appellants John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:10 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1792534] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:09 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1792532] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:08 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1792531] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:07 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790770] filed by Kevin W. McArdle on behalf of Appellees DOI, DOT, FTA and FWS. [19-5138] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/03/2019 05:07 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1787721] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/28/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/28/2019 [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:10 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787716] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01471-RJL filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5138. [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:07 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1796910] filed granting appellants' unopposed motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1793999-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 08/30/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/30/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/21/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 10/28/2019. Final Briefs due 11/12/2019. [19-5138] [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION [1793999] to establish briefing schedule filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua Length Certification: 333 words. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1792602] filed by DOI, DOT, FTA and FWS [Service Date: 06/13/2019 ] [19-5138] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1792541] submitted by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1792538] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1792537] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1792535] filed by William N. Lawton and co-counsel William S. Eubanks II on behalf of Appellants John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1792534] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1792532] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1792531] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790770] filed by Kevin W. McArdle on behalf of Appellees DOI, DOT, FTA and FWS. [19-5138] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/03/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1787721] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/28/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/28/2019 [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787716] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01471-RJL filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5138. [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.