This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/21/2019 at 06:05:20 (UTC).

John Edwards v. Vemma Nutrition, et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 John Edwards filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Vemma Nutrition. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16448

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Intervenor / Appellees

J. CLARK LAW FIRM PLLC

IVAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

IVAN & KILMARK PLC

FLORIN VALERIU IVAN

Glendale, AZ 85318

JUSTIN MATTHEW CLARK

Defendant / Appellees

VEMMA NUTRITION, DBA Bode Pro

BETHANY ALKAZIN

TOM ALKAZIN

HARESH MEHTA

VEMMA INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.

TARAK MEHTA

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN EDWARDS

San Jose, CA 95130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor / Appellee Attorney

Florin Valeriu Ivan Esquire

Attorney at Ivan & Kilmark, PLC

P.O. Box 10400

Glendale, AZ 85318

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jill Johnson Chasson

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Kent Brockelman

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Joel Taylor Fugate

Attorney at Sanders & Parks, P.C.

3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Edwards

4899 Campbell Ave.

San Jose, CA 95130

 

Court Documents

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #2

Case Opening Packett

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • (#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 07/29/2019. [11380754]--[COURT UPDATE: Upated docket to reflect correct paid date. 07/30/2019 by SLM] (RT) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11373605] (CKP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 08/19/2019. Transcript due 09/17/2019. Appellant John Edwards opening brief due 10/28/2019. Appellees Bethany Alkazin, Tom Alkazin, Justin Matthew Clark, Florin Valeriu Ivan, Ivan & Associates, P.C., Ivan & Kilmark PLC, J. Clark Law Firm PLLC, Haresh Mehta, Tarak Mehta, Vemma International Holdings, Inc. and Vemma Nutrition answering brief due 11/29/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11373113] (RT) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less