This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/04/2020 at 06:05:22 (UTC).

John Edwards, et al v. Vemma International Holdings,, et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 John Edwards filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Vemma International Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-17453

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN EDWARDS

Appellants

JUSTIN MATTHEW CLARK

Phoenix, AZ 85004

FLORIN VALERIU IVAN

Glendale, AZ 85318

Defendants

VEMMA VITAMINS PTY. LIMITED

VEMMA NUTRITION

TARAK MEHTA

Defendant / Appellees

VEMMA INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.

TOM ALKAZIN

HARESH MEHTA

BETHANY ALKAZIN

Intervenors

IVAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

J. CLARK LAW FIRM PLLC

IVAN & KILMARK PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Justin Matthew Clark

2 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Florin Valeriu Ivan Esquire

Attorney at Ivan & Kilmark, PLC

P.O. Box 10400

Glendale, AZ 85318

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jill Johnson Chasson

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Kent Brockelman

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 North Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Joel Taylor Fugate

Attorney at Sanders & Parks, P.C.

3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • Docket(#2) Deleted Incorrect Entry (Redocketed in No. 19-17543). Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Received copy filed in district court re: NOTICE of ERRATA by John A Slykerman re [83] Judgment, [82] Order. Motion filed by - John Edwards. [11544167] (JFF) [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 01/03/2020. Transcript due 02/03/2020. Appellants Justin Matthew Clark and Florin Valeriu Ivan opening brief due 03/12/2020. Appellees Bethany Alkazin, Tom Alkazin, Haresh Mehta and Vemma International Holdings, Inc. answering brief due 04/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11523537] (RT) [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Florin Valeriu Ivan Esquire