This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2019 at 06:03:41 (UTC).

John Doe v. Regents of the Univ of Texas, et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 John Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Regents of the Univ of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-51013

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN DOE

Defendant / Appellees

BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS

RENA S. DAY, Individually and in her official capacity

LAURA E. MITCHELL, Individually and in her official capacity

MELISSA HARRELL, Individually and in her official capacity

BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Kenneth Sergi

Attorney at Sergi & Associates, P.C.

329 S. Guadalupe Street

San Marcos, TX 78666

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin Lindberg Dower

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street, William P. Clements Building

Austin, TX 78701

Evan Scott Greene

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Esteban San Miguel Soto Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Solicitor General

300 W. 15Th Street, William P. Clements Building

Austin, TX 78701-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Kenneth Sergi for Mr. John Doe for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51013] (David Kenneth Sergi ) [Entered: 12/23/2019 09:55 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51013] (Evan Scott Greene ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/28/2020 for Appellant John Doe. [19-51013] (CMB) [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:53 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-51013] (Esteban San Miguel Soto ) [Entered: 11/18/2019 09:29 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to amend caption filed by Appellant John Doe [ # 9182640-2 ] [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:15 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant John Doe to amend caption [9182640-2]. Date of service: 11/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Dower; Attorney for Appellant: Sergi [19-51013] (David Kenneth Sergi ) [Entered: 11/04/2019 05:34 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-51013] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant John Doe advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 11/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Dower; Attorney for Appellant: Sergi [19-51013] (David Kenneth Sergi ) [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:26 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9182241-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 11/19/2019 for Appellant John Doe [19-51013] (SDH) [Entered: 11/04/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant John Doe [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:28 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Kenneth Sergi for Appellant John Doe in 19-51013 [19-51013] (WMJ) [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Evan Scott Greene for party(s) Appellee Melissa Harrell Appellee Rena S. Day Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas System Appellee Laura E. Mitchell, in case 19-51013 [19-51013] (SDH) [Entered: 12/23/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Kenneth Sergi for Mr. John Doe for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51013] (David Kenneth Sergi ) [Entered: 12/23/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51013] (Evan Scott Greene ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/28/2020 for Appellant John Doe. [19-51013] (CMB) [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-51013] (CMB) [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:19-CV-415. Electronic ROA due on 12/10/2019. [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • FEE PAID by Appellant John Doe. Fee deadline satisfied [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 11/25/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Esteban San Miguel Soto for party(s) Appellee Melissa Harrell Appellee Rena S. Day Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas System Appellee Laura E. Mitchell, in case 19-51013 [19-51013] (SDH) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-51013] (Esteban San Miguel Soto ) [Entered: 11/18/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellee Board of Regents of the University of Texas in 19-51013. [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Motion to amend caption filed by Appellant John Doe [ # 9182640-2 ] [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant John Doe to amend caption [9182640-2]. Date of service: 11/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Dower; Attorney for Appellant: Sergi [19-51013] (David Kenneth Sergi ) [Entered: 11/04/2019 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-51013] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant John Doe advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 11/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Dower; Attorney for Appellant: Sergi [19-51013] (David Kenneth Sergi ) [Entered: 11/04/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9182241-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 11/19/2019 for Appellant John Doe [19-51013] (SDH) [Entered: 11/04/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant John Doe [19-51013] (MVM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.