This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/09/2019 at 06:06:01 (UTC).

John Doe v. NOCCCD, et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 John Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NOCCCD. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55539

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BLANCA DOBSON

JOSE NUNEZ

BRANDON FLOERKE

NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, AKA NOCCCD

PAUL MCKINLEY

GRISELDA AGUIRRE

DOES, 1 through 50, inclusive

RUTH SIPPLE

IRMA RAMOS

MARK GREENHALGH

DAN WILLOUGHBY

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN D. DOE

Lakewood, CA 90712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Dennis J. Walsh

Attorney at Walsh & Associates, APC

16633 Ventura Blvd.

Encino, CA 91436

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John D. Doe

4067 Hardwick Street

Lakewood, CA 90712

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Additional Document

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received copy of Amended Notice of Appeal from district court filed on 7-3-2019. [11355359] (RT) [Entered: 07/05/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The May 9, 2019 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending May 7, 2019 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11298213] (CKP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant John D. Doe Correspondence: Notice of Errata in Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed in the District Court, and Corrected IFP motion. Date of service: 05/10/2019 [11293539] [19-55539] (Doe, John) [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Appellant John D. Doe motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/09/2019. [11293079] (JBS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/10/2019. Transcript due 07/08/2019. Appellant John D. Doe opening brief due 08/19/2019. Appellees Griselda Aguirre, Blanca Dobson, Does, Brandon Floerke, Mark Greenhalgh, Paul McKinley, North Orange County Community College District, Jose Nunez, Irma Ramos, Ruth Sipple and Dan Willoughby answering brief due 09/16/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11293076] (JBS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE is a litigant