This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/17/2022 at 06:10:53 (UTC).

John Doe, et al v. Google LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 John Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16934

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID J. HAYES

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOHN DOE

HENRY DOE

MICHAEL DOE

ROBERT DOE

CHRISTOPHER DOE

MATTHEW DOE

POLLY ST. GEORGE

JAMES DOE

SCOTT DEGROAT

DANIEL LEE

MISHEL MCCUMBER

JEFF PEDERSEN

JORDAN SATHER

SARAH WESTALL

Defendant / Appellees

GOOGLE LLC

YOUTUBE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

M. Cris Armenta

Attorney at Armenta & Sol, PC

11440 W Bernardo Courtsuite 300

San Diego, CA 92127

Credence Elizabeth Sol

Attorney at Armenta & Sol, PC

11440 W Bernardo Courtsuite 300

San Diego, CA 92127

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David H. Kramer Esquire

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Lauren Gallo White

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

One Market Plazasuite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12311735] (LW) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:37 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Scott DeGroat, Christopher Doe, Henry Doe, James Doe, John Doe, Matthew Doe, Michael Doe, Robert Doe, Daniel Lee, Mishel McCumber, Jeff Pedersen, Jordan Sather, Sarah Westall and Polly St. George Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/13/2021. [12313356] [21-16934] (Sol, Credence) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:13 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact Circuit Mediator to discuss services available through the Circuit Mediation Program or to request a settlement assessment conference. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [12315740] (VS) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:42 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact Circuit Mediator to discuss services available through the Circuit Mediation Program or to request a settlement assessment conference. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [12315740] (VS) [Entered: 12/14/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/13/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12313362]. [21-16934] (AD) [Entered: 12/13/2021 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Scott DeGroat, Christopher Doe, Henry Doe, James Doe, John Doe, Matthew Doe, Michael Doe, Robert Doe, Daniel Lee, Mishel McCumber, Jeff Pedersen, Jordan Sather, Sarah Westall and Polly St. George Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/13/2021. [12313356] [21-16934] (Sol, Credence) [Entered: 12/13/2021 04:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12311735] (LW) [Entered: 12/09/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Scott DeGroat, Christopher Doe, Henry Doe, James Doe, John Doe, Matthew Doe, Michael Doe, Robert Doe, Daniel Lee, Mishel McCumber, Jeff Pedersen, Jordan Sather, Polly St. George and Sarah Westall Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/26/2021. Transcript ordered by 12/17/2021. Transcript due 01/18/2022. Appellants Scott DeGroat, Christopher Doe, Henry Doe, James Doe, John Doe, Matthew Doe, Michael Doe, Robert Doe, Daniel Lee, Mishel McCumber, Jeff Pedersen, Jordan Sather, Polly St. George and Sarah Westall opening brief due 02/25/2022. Appellees Google LLC and YouTube, LLC answering brief due 03/28/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12291553] (JBS) [Entered: 11/18/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Gallo White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David H. Kramer