This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/21/2020 at 06:08:32 (UTC).

John Dinan, et al v. SanDisk LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 John Dinan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SanDisk LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15287

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

VAMSI CHODAY

BREN COHEE

JOHN DINAN

Defendant / Appellee

SANDISK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Jonathan Rosemergy

Attorney at Carey, Danis & Lowe

8235 Forsyth Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63105

Francis J. Flynn Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of Francis J. Flynn, Jr.

422 S. Curson Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Keith Edward Eggleton

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Anthony Weibell

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11650374] (VS) [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/17/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11615411] (VS) [Entered: 03/02/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/26/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11609700]. [20-15287] (AD) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Vamsi Choday, Bren Cohee and John Dinan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/26/2020. [11609652] [20-15287] (Flynn, Francis) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Vamsi Choday, Bren Cohee and John Dinan Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/28/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/23/2020. Transcript due 04/21/2020. Appellants Vamsi Choday, Bren Cohee and John Dinan opening brief due 06/01/2020. Appellee SanDisk LLC answering brief due 07/01/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11605307] (JBS) [Entered: 02/21/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SanDisk LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith E. Eggleton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony J Weibell