Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/01/2021 at 21:59:17 (UTC).

John DeJoria v. Maghreb Petroleum Expl S.A.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2014 John DeJoria filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Maghreb Petroleum Expl S A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-51022

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Amicus Curiae

Moroccan American Business Alliance

Meriem Bensaleha, in her capacity as President of la Confederation Generale des Entreprises du Maroc

Moroccan Bankers' Association

Taeib Fassi-Fihri, in his capacity as Counselor to the King of Morocco and Former Minister of Foreign Affairs for the Kingdom of Morocco

Plaintiff / Appellee

John Paul DeJoria

Defendant / Appellants

Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A.

Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Amal Laassel

4700 Millenia Boulevard

Orlando, FL 32839

Anthony Hotchkiss Anikeeff

Attorney at Williams Mullen

8300 Greensboro Drive

Mclean, VA 22102

Joseph Ray Pope

Attorney at Williams Mullen, P.C.

200 S. 10Th Street

Richmond, VA 23218-1320

Patrick Risdon Hanes

Attorney at Williams Mullen, P.C.

200 S. 10Th Street

Richmond, VA 23218-1320

Richard Phillips Hogan Jr.

Attorney at Hogan & Hogan

711 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Monica A. Fitzgerald

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease, L.L.P.

909 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77010

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Craig T. Enoch

Attorney at Enoch Kever, P.L.L.C.

7600 N. Capital Of Texas Highway, Building B

Austin, TX 78731

Jonathan Mark Little

Attorney at Baker Botts, L.L.P.

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Brian John Hurst

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie, L.L.P.

1900 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Eugenie Rogers

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie, L.L.P.

1900 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

John Matthew Schmitten Esq.

Attorney at Baker Botts, L.L.P.

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Melissa A. Lorber

Attorney at Enoch Kever, P.L.L.C.

7600 N. Capital Of Texas Highway, Building B

Austin, TX 78731

John Charles Carsey

Attorney at Minton, Burton, Bassett & Collins

1100 Guadalupe Street

Austin, TX 78701-2198

Michael A. Pollard Esq.

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie, L.L.P.

300 E. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Nicholas O'Brian Kennedy

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie, L.L.P.

1900 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Aaron Michael Streett

Attorney at Baker Botts, L.L.P.

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John Pierre Lahad

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Kenneth E. McNeil

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Geoffrey L. Harrison Esq.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #1

Supreme Court Order Received

Open Document

SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [8130904-2] was filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria on 02/16/2016. Supreme Court Number: 15-1033. [14-51022] (CAV) [Entered: 02/19/2016 08:39 AM]

Open Document #4

Bill of Cost

Open Document #3

Jgmt as Mdt

Open Document #2

Opinion

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #1

Court Order

Open Document

REPLY filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria [8062830-1] to the response/opposition filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A. and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited in 14-51022 [ # 8062493-2 ]. Date of Service: 11/19/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Anikeeff, Hanes, Hogan, Laassel, Oathout, Pope; Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad, McNeil; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Enoch, Hurst, Kennedy, Little, Lorber, Pollard, Rogers, Schmitten, Streett. [14-51022] (Aaron Michael Streett ) [Entered: 11/19/2015 09:33 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A. and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited [8062493-1] to the motion to vacate order filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria in 14-51022 [ # 8061815-2 ] Date of Service: 11/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Anikeeff, Hanes, Hogan, Laassel, Oathout, Pope; Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad, McNeil; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Enoch, Hurst, Kennedy, Little, Lorber, Pollard, Rogers, Schmitten, Streett. [14-51022] (Geoffrey L. Harrison ) [Entered: 11/18/2015 04:43 PM]

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria to vacate no action document [ # 8057158-2 ] [8061815-2], for reconsideration of the Order dated 11/16/2015 [8061815-3]. Date of service: 11/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Anikeeff, Hanes, Hogan, Laassel, Oathout, Pope; Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad, McNeil; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Enoch, Hurst, Kennedy, Little, Lorber, Pollard, Rogers, Schmitten, Streett [14-51022] (Aaron Michael Streett ) [Entered: 11/18/2015 11:59 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to extend time to file appellants' brief to and including 12/8/14 filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited [ # 7740624-2 ]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 12/08/2014 for Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited. [14-51022] (MCS) [Entered: 09/29/2014 11:40 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited to extend time to file brief as appellant until 12/08/2014 at 11:59 pm [7740624-2]. Date of service: 09/29/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Hurst [14-51022] (Geoffrey L. Harrison ) [Entered: 09/29/2014 09:27 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited advising transcript unnecessary / no hearings [14-51022] (JMW) [Entered: 09/26/2014 11:22 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/27/2014 for Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited. [14-51022] (SMH) [Entered: 09/16/2014 01:42 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7729536-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Electronic ROA due on 09/30/2014. [14-51022] (RLL) [Entered: 09/15/2014 11:52 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited [14-51022] (RLL) [Entered: 09/11/2014 10:32 AM]

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT ORDER received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria in 14-51022 on 06/20/2016. [8233335-1] [14-51022] (LGL) [Entered: 06/21/2016 07:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [8130904-2] was filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria on 02/16/2016. Supreme Court Number: 15-1033. [14-51022] (CAV) [Entered: 02/19/2016 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. The Bill of Costs is issued with the mandate. [14-51022] (MVM) [Entered: 11/24/2015 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketAttorney Michael P. Murphy for State of Texas is advised that we are taking no action on his appearance as his motion to file an amicus brief in support of rehearing has been denied. [14-51022] (SDH) [Entered: 11/19/2015 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER that the opposed motionof appellee John Paul DeJoria to vacate the order of 11/16/15 denying petition for rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED [ # 8061815-2 ]; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of the State of Texas for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of the petition for rehearing is DENIED [ # 8058546-2 ] filed by Judge(s): CES, RHB and ECP. [14-51022] (MCS) [Entered: 11/19/2015 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria [8062830-1] to the response/opposition filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A. and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited in 14-51022 [ # 8062493-2 ]. Date of Service: 11/19/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Anikeeff, Hanes, Hogan, Laassel, Oathout, Pope; Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad, McNeil; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Enoch, Hurst, Kennedy, Little, Lorber, Pollard, Rogers, Schmitten, Streett. [14-51022] (Aaron Michael Streett ) [Entered: 11/19/2015 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A. and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited [8062493-1] to the motion to vacate order filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria in 14-51022 [ # 8061815-2 ] Date of Service: 11/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Anikeeff, Hanes, Hogan, Laassel, Oathout, Pope; Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad, McNeil; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Enoch, Hurst, Kennedy, Little, Lorber, Pollard, Rogers, Schmitten, Streett. [14-51022] (Geoffrey L. Harrison ) [Entered: 11/18/2015 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [14-51022] (Michael P. Murphy ) [Entered: 11/18/2015 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria to vacate no action document [ # 8057158-2 ] [8061815-2], for reconsideration of the Order dated 11/16/2015 [8061815-3]. Date of service: 11/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Anikeeff, Hanes, Hogan, Laassel, Oathout, Pope; Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad, McNeil; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Enoch, Hurst, Kennedy, Little, Lorber, Pollard, Rogers, Schmitten, Streett [14-51022] (Aaron Michael Streett ) [Entered: 11/18/2015 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria [ # 8046384-2 ]; denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellee Mr. John Paul DeJoria [ # 8046337-2 ] Without Poll. Mandate pull date is 11/23/2015 [14-51022] (SDH) [Entered: 11/16/2015 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian John Hurst for Appellee John Paul DeJoria in 14-51022 [14-51022] (SDH) [Entered: 09/30/2014 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to extend time to file appellants' brief to and including 12/8/14 filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited [ # 7740624-2 ]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 12/08/2014 for Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited. [14-51022] (MCS) [Entered: 09/29/2014 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited to extend time to file brief as appellant until 12/08/2014 at 11:59 pm [7740624-2]. Date of service: 09/29/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Harrison, Lahad; Attorney for Appellees: Carsey, Hurst [14-51022] (Geoffrey L. Harrison ) [Entered: 09/29/2014 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Geoffrey L. Harrison for Appellant Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited in 14-51022, Attorney Geoffrey L. Harrison for Appellant Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA in 14-51022 [14-51022] (SDH) [Entered: 09/29/2014 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John Pierre Lahad for party(s) Appellant Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited Appellant Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA, in case 14-51022 [14-51022] (SDH) [Entered: 09/29/2014 08:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited advising transcript unnecessary / no hearings [14-51022] (JMW) [Entered: 09/26/2014 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/27/2014 for Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited. [14-51022] (SMH) [Entered: 09/16/2014 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [14-51022] (SMH) [Entered: 09/16/2014 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7729536-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Electronic ROA due on 09/30/2014. [14-51022] (RLL) [Entered: 09/15/2014 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Maghreb Petroleum Exploration SA and Mideast Fund for Morocco, Limited [14-51022] (RLL) [Entered: 09/11/2014 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey L Harrison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P. Lahad