This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/12/2021 at 06:40:48 (UTC).

John Creel v. Mark Loy, et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 John Creel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mark Loy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35280

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN MATTHEW CREEL, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joshua Matthew Creel, on behalf of the heirs of Joshua Matthew Creel

Defendant / Appellees

MARK G. LOY

DOES, 1-10

ACTIVE TRUCK TRANSPORT, LLC, d/b/a ACTIVE USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jacqueline T. Lenmark

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 North Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601

Murry Warhank

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 North Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601

Martha T. Starkey

Attorney at Harrison & Moberly, LLP

760 South Rangeline Road, Suite 164

Carmel, IN 46032

Charles E. Oswald

Attorney at Harrison Moberly LLP

10 W. Market Street, Suite 700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Shane MacIntyre

Attorney at Brown Law Firm

269 W. Front Street, Suite A

Missoula, MT 59802

Adam Shaw

Attorney at Brown Law Firm

269 W. Front Street, Suite A

Missoula, MT 59802

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#3

#5

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed order MEDIATION (CG): There will be a mediation held by video in this matter on June 18, 2021, at 8:30 a.m. Pacific Time. The session is scheduled for four hours. Counsel will receive access and confidentiality information by email. See Circuit Rule 33-1(c). [SEE TEXT OF ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] [12132504] (SB) [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The existing briefing schedule is VACATED. The following briefing schedule shall govern this appeal: Appellants opening brief is due July 8, 2021; appellees answering brief is due August 9, 2021; appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days of service of the answering brief. [12126546] (SB) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/26/2021. See order for details. [12112459] (LW) [Entered: 05/13/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Charles E. Oswald and Martha T. Starkey for party(s) Appellant John Matthew Creel. [12089545] (RL) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Martha T. Starkey (Harrison & Moberly, LLP, 760 S. Rangeline Road, Suite 164, Carmel, Indiana 46032) for Appellant John Matthew Creel. Date of service: 04/28/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12089540] [21-35280] (Starkey, Martha) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Charles E. Oswald (Harrison & Moberly, LLP, 10 W. Market Street, Suite 700, Indianapolis, Indiana 46204) for Appellant John Matthew Creel. Date of service: 04/28/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12089532] [21-35280] (Oswald, Charles) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Adam Shaw for party(s) Appellee Active Truck Transport, LLC Appellee Mark G. Loy. [12089006] (RL) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam M. Shaw (Brown Law Firm, 269 W. Front St, Ste A, Missoula, MT 59802) for Appellees Active Truck Transport, LLC and Mark G. Loy. Date of service: 04/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12088993] [21-35280] (Shaw, Adam) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/11/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12086943] (LW) [Entered: 04/26/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/20/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12081601]. [21-35280] (AD) [Entered: 04/20/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant John Matthew Creel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/20/2021. [12081125] [21-35280] (Lenmark, Jacqueline) [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#2) Terminated Adam R. Shaw for Mark G. Loy and Active Truck Transport, LLC in 21-35280 as the attorney was added in error to the case. [12072543] (JMR) [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant John Matthew Creel Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/20/2021. Appellant John Matthew Creel opening brief due 06/08/2021. Appellees Active Truck Transport, LLC, Does and Mark G. Loy answering brief due 07/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12072359] (JMR) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Active USA LLC is a litigant