This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/06/2023 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

John Banks v. State of Arizona, et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 John Banks filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against State of Arizona,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-15017

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendants

TIFFANY MILLER, substituted in place of unknown party named as Facility Health Administrator

MICHAEL A. CZIGLER, substituted in place of unknown party named as Facility Health Administrator

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN J. BANKS

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendant / Appellees

STATE OF ARIZONA

DAVID SHINN, Director, named as David L. Shinn, director Arizona Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John J. Banks

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - LEWIS

P.O. Box 3300

Buckeye, AZ 85326

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Catherine Lombino

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jonathan Yenhing Yu

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson, PC

2800 N Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1580

Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson, PC

2800 N Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-1580

Lucy Marie Rand

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GABRIEL P. SANCHEZ): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the December 19, 2022 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12639735] (AF) [Entered: 01/26/2023 01:59 PM]

#3

(#3) MANDATE ISSUED. (KMW, RRC and GPS) [12655449] (NAC) [Entered: 02/17/2023 07:52 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MANDATE ISSUED. (KMW, RRC and GPS) [12655449] (NAC) [Entered: 02/17/2023 07:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GABRIEL P. SANCHEZ): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the December 19, 2022 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12639735] (AF) [Entered: 01/26/2023 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 01/30/2023. Transcript due 02/28/2023. Appellant John J. Banks opening brief due 04/10/2023. Appellees David Shinn, Director and State of Arizona answering brief due 05/10/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12623697] (JBS) [Entered: 01/05/2023 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less