This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/27/2022 at 06:15:45 (UTC).

Jody McCormick, et al v. Eduardo Cardenas, et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Jody McCormick, filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Eduardo Cardenas,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-17133

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendants

STATE OF ARIZONA

THOMAS HEATHCOCK

Plaintiff / Appellees

JODY MCCORMICK, on her own behalf and as person representative of the Estate of Andrew McCormick

STEVEN MCCORMICK, father of Andrew McCormick

Defendant / Appellant

EDUARDO CARDENAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Donna McDaniel

Attorney at BIHN & McDANIEL, PLC

2600 N Central Ave., Suite 1775

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Martin A. Bihn

Attorney at BIHN & McDANIEL, PLC

2600 N Central Ave., Suite 1775

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Christina Gail Retts

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85281

Tara Brooke Zoellner

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85281

Kathleen L. Wieneke

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85281

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Eduardo Cardenas Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/05/2022. [12332330] [21-17133] (Wieneke, Kathleen) [Entered: 01/05/2022 03:12 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/25/2022, 12:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12337414] [21-17133, 21-17134] (CL) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:54 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeals are pending. [12351257] [21-17133, 21-17134] (CL) [Entered: 01/25/2022 05:00 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Eduardo Cardenas to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Eduardo Cardenas opening brief due 04/01/2022. Appellees Jody McCormick and Steven McCormick answering brief due 05/02/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12370966] (BG) [Entered: 02/15/2022 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Eduardo Cardenas. New requested due date is 04/01/2022. [12370541] [21-17133] (Wieneke, Kathleen) [Entered: 02/15/2022 10:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeals are pending. [12351257] [21-17133, 21-17134] (CL) [Entered: 01/25/2022 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/25/2022, 12:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12337414] [21-17133, 21-17134] (CL) [Entered: 01/11/2022 11:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/05/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12332714]. [21-17133] (AD) [Entered: 01/05/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Eduardo Cardenas Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/05/2022. [12332330] [21-17133] (Wieneke, Kathleen) [Entered: 01/05/2022 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Eduardo Cardenas Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/05/2022. Appellant Eduardo Cardenas opening brief due 03/02/2022. Appellees Jody McCormick and Steven McCormick answering brief due 04/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12327301] (RT) [Entered: 12/29/2021 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less