This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 06:11:46 (UTC).

Jody Coonley v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Jody Coonley filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1107

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

JODY C. COONLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alison Ross Wickizer Toepp

Attorney at REED SMITH, LLP

Riverfront Plaza, West Tower, 901 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4069

Douglas Edward Pittman

Attorney at REED SMITH, LLP

Riverfront Plaza, West Tower, 901 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4069

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Henry Woods McLaughlin Esq. III

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HENRY MCLAUGHLIN, P.C.

707 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jody C. Coonley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000463443] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:01 PM]

#14

(#14) MOTION by Jody C. Coonley to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until April 8, 2019.. Date and method of service: 03/25/2019 ecf. [1000481303] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:27 PM]

#11

(#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1107] MRB [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:20 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Carlyle Elise Bruemmer. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/10/2019. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:02 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER filed [1000464195] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/26/2019. Response brief due 04/25/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1107] DL [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:01 PM]

#6

(#6) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jody C. Coonley re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form, and filing of docketing statement. Appearance form due on 02/22/2019 from Henry Woods McLaughlin III. Disclosure statement due from Jody C. Coonley on 02/22/2019. Docketing statement due from Jody C. Coonley on 02/22/2019. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:32 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Henry McLaughlin for Jody C. Coonley. [1000463442] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:00 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Douglas E. PIttman for Wells Fargo Bank National Association. [1000465960] [19-1107] Douglas Pittman [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1107] MRB [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:08 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00192-JAG. Mailed to: Alison Ross Wickizer Toepp; Carlyle Elise Bruemmer. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:55 PM]

#16

(#16) ORDER filed [1000481358] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 13. Opening brief and appendix due 04/08/2019. Response brief due 05/08/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:49 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alison Wickizer Toepp for Wells Fargo Bank National Association. [1000452553] [19-1107] Alison Toepp [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:51 AM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000452559] [19-1107] Alison Toepp [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:52 AM]

#15

(#15) Memorandum referencing [ # 14 ] Motion by Jody C. Coonley. [1000481315] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:33 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00192-JAG. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:53 PM]

#9

(#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jody C. Coonley. [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:03 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER filed [1000481358] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 13. Opening brief and appendix due 04/08/2019. Response brief due 05/08/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Memorandum referencing [ # 14 ] Motion by Jody C. Coonley. [1000481315] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION by Jody C. Coonley to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until April 8, 2019.. Date and method of service: 03/25/2019 ecf. [1000481303] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1107] MRB [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Douglas E. PIttman for Wells Fargo Bank National Association. [1000465960] [19-1107] Douglas Pittman [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER filed [1000464195] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/26/2019. Response brief due 04/25/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1107] DL [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1107] MRB [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jody C. Coonley. [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jody C. Coonley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000463443] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Henry McLaughlin for Jody C. Coonley. [1000463442] [19-1107] Henry McLaughlin [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jody C. Coonley re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form, and filing of docketing statement. Appearance form due on 02/22/2019 from Henry Woods McLaughlin III. Disclosure statement due from Jody C. Coonley on 02/22/2019. Docketing statement due from Jody C. Coonley on 02/22/2019. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000452559] [19-1107] Alison Toepp [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alison Wickizer Toepp for Wells Fargo Bank National Association. [1000452553] [19-1107] Alison Toepp [Entered: 02/06/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Carlyle Elise Bruemmer. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/10/2019. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00192-JAG. Mailed to: Alison Ross Wickizer Toepp; Carlyle Elise Bruemmer. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00192-JAG. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1107] EB [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.