This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:13 (UTC).

Joaquin Acosta v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Joaquin Acosta filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55812

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL

JOSEPH B. WIDMAN, and his domestic partner/spouse

ANWAR KAHN, United States Deputy General and his domestic partner/spouse

DEVEREE KOPP, and her domestic partner/spouse

MARK R. SNYDER, and his domestic partner/spouse

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

U.S. FORESTRY SAN BERNARDINO NATIONAL FOREST

EILEEEN M. DECKER, and her domestic partner/spouse

DOES, unknown men/women, and each of their assumed/presumed betrothed/spouse and or domestic partners who assisted the above identified individuals

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOAQUIN ANDRES ACOSTA

Big Bear Lake, CA 92315

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Richard M. Park

Attorney at USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joaquin Andres Acosta

P.O. Box 2889

Big Bear Lake, CA 92315

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Joaquin Andres Acosta motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/29/2019. [11381065] (CW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:43 AM]

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

2 #3

Additional Document

#4

(#4) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The opening brief is due October 9, 2019; the answering brief is due November 8, 2019; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. (MOATT) [11405144] (JPD) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:11 AM]

#2

Main Document

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The opening brief is due October 9, 2019; the answering brief is due November 8, 2019; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. (MOATT) [11405144] (JPD) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Joaquin Andres Acosta motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/29/2019. [11381065] (CW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11366288] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joaquin Andres Acosta opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellees Eileeen M. Decker, Does, Anwar Kahn, Deveree Kopp, Mark R. Snyder, U.S. Forestry San Bernardino National Forest, United States Attorney General, United States of America and Joseph B. Widman answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11365039] (RT) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.