This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/14/2022 at 06:06:07 (UTC).

Joan Risner, et al v. Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Joan Risner, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-56242

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendants

DIANE MACHAIN, an individual

DOES, 1-25, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellees

JOAN RISNER, deceased, by and through her personal legal representative and successor in interest Bonnie Harris

BONNIE HARRIS, individually

CHARLES RISNER, individually

Defendant / Appellant

SILVERSCREEN HEALTHCARE, INC., DBA Asistencia Villa Rehabilitation and Care Center, Erroneously Sued As Cal-Red Facility, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Allen Oghassabian Esquire

Attorney at The Barnes Firm, LC

655 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Christian R. Oliver

Attorney at The Barnes Firm, LC

655 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Lann G. McIntyre Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Kathleen M. Walker Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 W 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/22/2021. [12295975] [21-56242] (McIntyre, Lann) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:35 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/13/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12299581] (VS) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:45 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Docket(#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. opening brief due 02/10/2022. Appellees Bonnie Harris, Charles Risner and Joan Risner answering brief due 03/14/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12336648] (BG) [Entered: 01/10/2022 05:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc.. New requested due date is 02/10/2022. [12336531] [21-56242] (McIntyre, Lann) [Entered: 01/10/2022 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/13/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12299581] (VS) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/22/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12296025]. [21-56242] (AD) [Entered: 11/22/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/22/2021. [12295975] [21-56242] (McIntyre, Lann) [Entered: 11/22/2021 05:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/22/2021. Appellant Silverscreen Healthcare, Inc. opening brief due 01/11/2022. Appellees Bonnie Harris, Charles Risner and Joan Risner answering brief due 02/10/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12287318] (JBS) [Entered: 11/15/2021 01:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less