This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2019 at 06:05:43 (UTC).

Jimmy Scott v. Piedmont Columbus Regional Hos

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Jimmy Scott filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Piedmont Columbus Regional Hos. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12364

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JIMMY SCOTT

Columbus, GA 31901

Defendant / Appellee

PIEDMONT COLUMBUS REGIONAL HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jimmy Scott

314 6Th St

Columbus, GA 31901

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Wayne M. Cartwright II

Attorney at Hall Arbery Gilligan Roberts & Shanlever, LLP

3340 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 1900

Atlanta, GA 30326

Matthew J. Gilligan

Attorney at Hall Arbery Gilligan Roberts & Shanlever, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott [ # 8847499-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew J. Gilligan for Appellee Piedmont Columbus Regional Hospital. [19-12364] (ECF: Matthew Gilligan) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:35 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 10/15/2019 filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8847499-1] [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:50 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-12364] (ECF: Matthew Gilligan) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:27 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott. [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:52 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jimmy Scott. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:51 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wayne M. Cartwright II for Piedmont Healthcare. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12364] (ECF: Wayne Cartwright) [Entered: 07/02/2019 11:10 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wayne M. Cartwright, II for Piedmont Columbus Regional Hospital. [19-12364] (ECF: Wayne Cartwright) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:29 PM]

Open Document #4

DC Order Doc 19

Open Document #3

DC Judgment Doc 20

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and incuding September 12, 2019, in which to file Appellant's brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [ # 8847499-2 ] (BBM) [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott [ # 8847499-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew J. Gilligan for Appellee Piedmont Columbus Regional Hospital. [19-12364] (ECF: Matthew Gilligan) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 10/15/2019 filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8847499-1] [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-12364] (ECF: Matthew Gilligan) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott. [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Party Jimmy Scott. Appellants brief due on 08/13/2019 as to Appellant Jimmy Scott. Appendix due on 08/20/2019 as to Appellant Jimmy Scott. Orginially due on 7/30/19 [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jimmy Scott. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wayne M. Cartwright II for Piedmont Healthcare. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12364] (ECF: Wayne Cartwright) [Entered: 07/02/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wayne M. Cartwright, II for Piedmont Columbus Regional Hospital. [19-12364] (ECF: Wayne Cartwright) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jimmy Scott on 06/19/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/30/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/05/2019 as to Appellant Jimmy Scott. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/18/2019 as to Appellee Piedmont Columbus Regional Hospital [Entered: 06/21/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less