This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2019 at 06:08:07 (UTC).

Jillian Izzio, et al v. Century Golf Partners Mgmt.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 Jillian Izzio filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Century Golf Partners Mgmt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10306

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

JILLIAN BRANA

Petitioner / Appellant

ANTHONY METZGER

Plaintiff / Appellees

JILLIAN IZZIO, on Behalf of Themselves and all Others Similarly Situated

HEATHER ZOELLER, on Behalf of Themselves and all Others Similarly Situated

KARA ASHBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant and Appellant Attorneys

Annette Gifford

Attorney at Thomas & Solomon, L.L.P.

693 East Avenue

Rochester, NY 14607

Jimmy Derek Braziel

Attorney at Lee & Braziel, L.L.P.

1801 N. Lamar Street

Dallas, TX 75202

J. Nelson Thomas

Attorney at Thomas & Solomon, L.L.P.

693 East Avenue

Rochester, NY 14607

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Innessa Melamed Huot

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, L.L.P.

685 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Brian J. Hutchison

Attorney at Muscato, DiMillo & Vona, L.L.P.

107 East Avenue

Lockport, NY 14094

Adam Gonnelli

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, L.L.P.

685 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Kenneth M. Stillman

11300 N. Central Expressway, Royal Central Tower

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Craig Benson because Century Partners Golf Management, L.P. is not a party in this appeal [19-10306] (RSM) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:44 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (J. Nelson Thomas ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:52 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (Kenneth M. Stillman ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Anthony Metzger and Ms. Jillian Branafor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Braziel, Thomas; Attorney for Appellees: Gonnelli, Huot, Stillman; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Gifford; Attorney for Appellee: Hutchison. [19-10306] (J. Nelson Thomas ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Innessa Melamed Huot for Ms. Kara Ashby, Ms. Jillian Izzio and Ms. Heather Zoeller for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10306] (Innessa Melamed Huot ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (Craig R. Benson ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:42 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/10/2019 for Appellants Jillian Brana and Anthony Metzger. [19-10306] (LEF) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:11 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (Jessica F. Pizzutelli ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:21 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011976-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/08/2019 for Appellants Jillian Brana and Anthony Metzger [19-10306] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:32 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jillian Brana and Mr. Anthony Metzger [19-10306] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Annette Gifford for Ms. Jillian Brana and Mr. Anthony Metzger for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10306] (Annette Gifford ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:33 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/10/2019 for Appellants Jillian Brana and Anthony Metzger. [19-10306] (LEF) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10306] (LEF) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Craig Benson because Century Partners Golf Management, L.P. is not a party in this appeal [19-10306] (RSM) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Annette Gifford for Appellant Jillian Brana in 19-10306, Attorney Annette Gifford for Appellant Anthony Metzger in 19-10306. [19-10306] (DMS) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Annette Gifford for Ms. Jillian Brana and Mr. Anthony Metzger for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10306] (Annette Gifford ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney J. Nelson Thomas for Appellant Jillian Brana in 19-10306, Attorney J. Nelson Thomas for Appellant Anthony Metzger in 19-10306 [19-10306] (DMS) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kenneth M. Stillman for Appellee Kara Ashby in 19-10306, Attorney Kenneth M. Stillman for Appellee Heather Zoeller in 19-10306, Attorney Kenneth M. Stillman for Appellee Jillian Izzio in 19-10306 [19-10306] (CB) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (Kenneth M. Stillman ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:14-CV-3194; 3:15-CV-861. Electronic ROA due on 04/23/2019. [19-10306] (MFY) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Jillian Brana and Mr. Anthony Metzger advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-10306] (MFY) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Anthony Metzger and Ms. Jillian Branafor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Braziel, Thomas; Attorney for Appellees: Gonnelli, Huot, Stillman; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Gifford; Attorney for Appellee: Hutchison. [19-10306] (J. Nelson Thomas ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Attorney J. Nelson Thomas added as counsel of record for Appellants Jillian Brana and Anthony Metzger in 19-10306 [19-10306] (MVM) [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (J. Nelson Thomas ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Innessa Melamed Huot for Appellee Kara Ashby in 19-10306, Attorney Innessa Melamed Huot for Appellee Heather Zoeller in 19-10306, Attorney Innessa Melamed Huot for Appellee Jillian Izzio in 19-10306 [19-10306] (LEF) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (Craig R. Benson ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Innessa Melamed Huot for Ms. Kara Ashby, Ms. Jillian Izzio and Ms. Heather Zoeller for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10306] (Innessa Melamed Huot ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-10306] (Jessica F. Pizzutelli ) [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011976-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/08/2019 for Appellants Jillian Brana and Anthony Metzger [19-10306] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jillian Brana and Mr. Anthony Metzger [19-10306] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.