This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:58 (UTC).

Jihad Shahaddah v. Deputy Gotcher

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jihad Shahaddah filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Deputy Gotcher. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7030

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

COUNTY OF ARLINGTON

Defendant / Appellees

DEPUTY GOTCHER, with Arlington County Sheriff's Dept.

ARLINGTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

BETH ARTHUR

Plaintiff / Appellant

JIHAD SHAHADDAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Philip Corliss Krone

Attorney at COOK CRAIG & FRANCUZENKO, PLLC

3050 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Alexander Francuzenko

Attorney at COOK CRAIG & FRANCUZENKO, PLLC

3050 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Harsh Kalyan Voruganti

1655 North Fort Myer Drive

Arlington, VA

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jihad Shahaddah ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:08 AM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip C. Krone for Deputy Gotcher. [1000552854] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:59 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip C. Krone for Beth Arthur. [1000552852] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:58 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Harsh Voruganti for Jihad Shahaddah. [1000554416] [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:44 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip C. Krone for Arlington County Sheriff's Department. [1000552851] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:57 PM]

#21

(#21) MOTION by Jihad Shahaddah to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 23, 2019.. Date and method of service: 09/04/2019 ecf. [1000581104] [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:00 PM]

#22

(#22) ORDER filed [1000581114] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 21 ] Number of days granted: 14. Opening brief and appendix due 09/23/2019. Response brief due 10/23/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:08 PM]

#16

(#16) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jihad Shahaddah. [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:34 PM]

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Deputy Gotcher. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000552857] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:02 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alexander Francuzenko for Arlington County Sheriff's Department. [1000552848] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:51 PM]

#12

No Description Available

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alexander Francuzenko for Beth Arthur. [1000552849] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:52 PM]

#17

(#17) PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by Jihad Shahaddah. [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:57 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00883-TSE-TCB. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:07 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alexander Francuzenko for Deputy Gotcher. [1000552850] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:55 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00883-TSE-TCB. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:07 AM]

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jihad Shahaddah. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000554417] [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:46 PM]

#11

No Description Available

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER filed [1000581114] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 21 ] Number of days granted: 14. Opening brief and appendix due 09/23/2019. Response brief due 10/23/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION by Jihad Shahaddah to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until September 23, 2019.. Date and method of service: 09/04/2019 ecf. [1000581104] [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/09/2019. Response Brief due 10/09/2019 [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/31/2019 07:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER filed [1000557286] granting for leave to proceed PLRA [18] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Jihad Shahaddah #1046339. Copies to all parties. Mailed to PLRA custodian. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/31/2019 07:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#18) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Jihad Shahaddah. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by Jihad Shahaddah. [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jihad Shahaddah. [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jihad Shahaddah. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000554417] [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Harsh Voruganti for Jihad Shahaddah. [1000554416] [19-7030] Harsh Voruganti [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Deputy Gotcher. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000552857] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip C. Krone for Deputy Gotcher. [1000552854] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip C. Krone for Beth Arthur. [1000552852] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Philip C. Krone for Arlington County Sheriff's Department. [1000552851] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alexander Francuzenko for Deputy Gotcher. [1000552850] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alexander Francuzenko for Beth Arthur. [1000552849] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alexander Francuzenko for Arlington County Sheriff's Department. [1000552848] [19-7030] Alexander Francuzenko [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00883-TSE-TCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jihad Shahaddah ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00883-TSE-TCB. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00883-TSE-TCB. Case manager: JRice. [19-7030] JR [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.