This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2020 at 06:06:57 (UTC).

Jianna Hoot v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Jianna Hoot filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1860

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

JIANNA Y. HOOT

Defendant / Appellant

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Lynn Fisher

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER L. FISHER

P.O. Box 411

Marysville, KS 66508

Ann M. Trzynka

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANN TRZYNKA LLC

716 Broadway Street, P.O. Box 534

New Haven, IN 46774

Arpit Kumar Garg

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Jennifer L. Fisher

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER L. FISHER

P.O. Box 411

Marysville, KS 66508

Daniel Volchok

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Aguilar

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Stacey Cole

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

6401 Security Boulevard

Baltimore, MD 21235-0000

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/20/2020 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/20/2020 for Duane A. Hekter and Jianna Y. Hoot. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/10/2020 for Appellant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. JB [7085508] [20-1855, 20-1860] (ER) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:58 PM]

#4

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/30/2020 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/30/2020 for Duane A. Hekter and Jianna Y. Hoot. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/20/2020 for Appellant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (See order for details.) DW [2] [7082749] [20-1855, 20-1860] (CG) [Entered: 05/22/2020 12:03 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joseph M. Meyer for Appellee Jianna Y. Hoot in 20-1860. [16] [7094471] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1860, 20-1855] (Meyer, Joseph) [Entered: 07/17/2020 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joseph M. Meyer for Appellee Duane A. Hekter in 20-1855. [15] [7094470] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1855, 20-1860] (Meyer, Joseph) [Entered: 07/17/2020 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Arpit K. Garg for Appellee Duane A. Hekter. [14] [7094389] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1855] [Edited 07/17/2020 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Garg, Arpit) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel S. Volchok for Appellee Duane A. Hekter. [13] [7094382] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1855] -[Edited 07/17/2020 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Volchok, Daniel) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance form filed by Attorney Arpit K. Garg for Appellee Jianna Y. Hoot. [12] [7094391] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1860] --[Edited 07/17/2020 by ER - added Attorney Arpit K. Garg] (Garg, Arpit) [Entered: 07/17/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel S. Volchok for Appellee Jianna Y. Hoot. [11] [7094387] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1860] -[Edited 07/17/2020 by ER - added Attorney Daniel S. Volchok] (Volchok, Daniel) [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jennifer L. Fisher for Appellee Jianna Y. Hoot in 20-1860. [10] [7085711] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1860, 20-1855] (Fisher, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jennifer L. Fisher for Appellee Duane A. Hekter in 20-1855. [9] [7085710] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1855, 20-1860] (Fisher, Jennifer) [Entered: 06/08/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ann M. Trzynka for Appellee Jianna Y. Hoot in 20-1860. [8] [7085558] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1860, 20-1855] --[Edited 06/08/2020 by AP-to reflect the addition of counsel] (Trzynka, Ann) [Entered: 06/06/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/20/2020 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/20/2020 for Duane A. Hekter and Jianna Y. Hoot. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/10/2020 for Appellant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. JB [7085508] [20-1855, 20-1860] (ER) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7083345] [20-1860] (Aguilar, Daniel) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2020 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/05/2020 for Duane A. Hekter and Jianna Y. Hoot. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/26/2020 for Appellant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. JB [7083114] [20-1855, 20-1860] (AG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, June 5, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [4] [7083112] [20-1855, 20-1860] (AG) [Entered: 05/26/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appearance form filed by Attorney Daniel Aguilar for Appellant Andrew M. Saul in 20-1855, 20-1860. [3] [7082819] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1855, 20-1860] --[Edited 05/22/2020 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Aguilar, Daniel) [Entered: 05/22/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/30/2020 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/30/2020 for Duane A. Hekter and Jianna Y. Hoot. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/20/2020 for Appellant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (See order for details.) DW [2] [7082749] [20-1855, 20-1860] (CG) [Entered: 05/22/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) U.S. civil case docketed. U.S. Appeal. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security by 05/27/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 06/04/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/30/2020 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. [1] [7082517] [20-1860] (AG) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Aguilar