This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2019 at 06:06:47 (UTC).

Jhon Brisken v. B. Griego, et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Jhon Brisken filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against B Griego. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15636

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

A. RODRIGUEZ

BATTERMAN

PATTY SELLS

JOSEPH TAYLOR, Warden

BAEL

SAGUARO CORRECTIONAL CENTER

BEAL

M. ORTEGA

CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellees

T. THOMAS, Warden

BEARD, Physician

UNKNOWN GILWRATH, Physician

B. GRIEGO, Assistant Warden

Plaintiff / Appellant

JHON NIGEL BRISKEN

Eloy, AZ 85131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rachel Love

Attorney at Struck, Wieneke & Love, PLC

3100 W. Ray Road

Chandler, AZ 85226

Daniel Patrick Struck Esquire

Attorney at Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo PLC

3100 W. Ray Road, Suite 300

Chandler, AZ 85226

Kevin L. Nguyen

Attorney at Struck Love Bojanowski & Acedo PLC

3100 W. Ray Road, Suite 300

Chandler, AZ 85226

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jhon Nigel Brisken

Attorney at SAGUARO CORRECTIONAL CENTER

1252 E. Arica Road

Eloy, AZ 85131

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellees T. Thomas, B. Griego and Unknown Gilwrath Correspondence: Notice of Non-Response. Date of service: 05/23/2019 [11307839] [19-15636] (Nguyen, Kevin) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:22 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/05/2019. [11297911] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:29 AM]

#5

(#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 05/03/2019. [Case Number 19-15636: Partially Paid] [11297927] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:35 AM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/03/2019. [11297953] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:44 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken motion for all the document that were striken from the record forwarded to the 9th cir court . Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/05/2019. [11297945] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:41 AM]

#8

(#8) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken opening brief (Informal: Yes) 50 pages. Served on 05/05/2019. Major deficiencies: case closed. [11298679] (KT) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:31 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11253148] (CKP) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:26 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CKP) Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. (Order dated 04/04/2019). This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11290410] (CKP) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:11 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed (ECF) Appellees T. Thomas, B. Griego and Unknown Gilwrath Correspondence: Notice of Non-Response. Date of service: 05/23/2019 [11307839] [19-15636] (Nguyen, Kevin) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • (#10) Added attorney Kevin L. Nguyen for B. Griego Unknown Gilwrath Beard T. Thomas, in case 19-15636. [11307784] (JFF) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kevin L. Nguyen for Appellees T. Thomas, B. Griego and Unknown Gilwrath. Date of service: 05/23/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11307256] [19-15636] (Nguyen, Kevin) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken opening brief (Informal: Yes) 50 pages. Served on 05/05/2019. Major deficiencies: case closed. [11298679] (KT) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/03/2019. [11297953] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken motion for all the document that were striken from the record forwarded to the 9th cir court . Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/05/2019. [11297945] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 05/03/2019. [Case Number 19-15636: Partially Paid] [11297927] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/05/2019. [11297911] (JFF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CKP) Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. (Order dated 04/04/2019). This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11290410] (CKP) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11253148] (CKP) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jhon Nigel Brisken opening brief due 05/28/2019. Appellees Beard, B. Griego, T. Thomas and Unknown Gilwrath answering brief due 06/27/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11252759] (JPD) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.