This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2019 at 06:01:30 (UTC).

Jhen Scutella v. James Cousins, III, et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Jhen Scutella filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against James Cousins, III. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2238

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JHEN SCUTELLA

Defendant / Appellees

PATROLMAN ROBERT WILLIAMS

PATROLMAN JAMES COUSINS, III

LT. GOOZDICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Timothy D. McNair Esq.

821 State Street

Erie, PA 16501

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Catherine M. Doyle Esq.

Attorney at Office of City Solicitor

626 State Street, Municipal Building, Room 505

Erie, PA 16501

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document #1

Standing Order

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Instructions

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Catherine M. Doyle, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Patrolman James Cousins 3rd, Patrolman Robert E. Williams, Lieutenant Goozdich. [19-2238] (CMD) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:35 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:11 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella, received. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:06 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella, filed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:24 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella, filed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:03 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Timothy D. McNair, Esq., Catherine M. Doyle, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/13/2019. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document #4

Caption

Open Document #2

DC Judgment

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella due on or before 08/19/2019. Appendix due on or before 08/19/2019. (MB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Catherine M. Doyle, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Patrolman James Cousins 3rd, Patrolman Robert E. Williams, Lieutenant Goozdich. [19-2238] (CMD) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella, received. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella, filed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jhen Scutella, filed. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy D McNair on behalf of Appellant(s) Jhen Scutella. [19-2238] (TDM) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Timothy D. McNair, Esq., Catherine M. Doyle, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/13/2019. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jhen Scutella in District Court No. 1-17-cv-00222. (MB) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less