This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:03 (UTC).

Jesus Agredano, et al v. State Farm Lloyds

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Jesus Agredano filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Lloyds. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50656

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

JESUS AGREDANO

MARGARET AGREDANO

Defendant / Appellee

STATE FARM LLOYDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joshua P. Davis

1010 Lamar Street

Houston, TX 77002-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Katherine M. Willis

Attorney at Allen, Stein & Durbin, P.C.

6243 Ih-10, W.

San Antonio, TX 78201-0000

Melissa Lorber

Attorney at Enoch Kever, P.L.L.C.

5918 W. Courtyard Drive

Austin, TX 78730

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend the time for filing the transcript and waive discount filed by Ms. Pamela Joy Andasola [ # 9138451-2 ] Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 09/26/2019 for Pamela Joy Andasola, Court Reporter [19-50656] (MFY) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Gigi Simcox. [19-50656] (Gigi Simcox ) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Ms. Margaret Agredano is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50656] (Gigi Simcox ) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:28 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50656] (Chris Poage ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:58 PM]

Open Document #1

Reptr-1 Letter

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joshua P. Davis for Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50656] (Joshua P. Davis ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:36 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50656] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:12 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano [19-50656] (RSM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:02 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document

MOTION OF COURT REPORTER filed by Ms. Pamela Joy Andasola to extend the time for filing the transcript until 09/26/2019 and to waive the discount date [9138451-2]. Date of Service: 09/05/2019 via email - Court Reporter Andasola; Originating Clerk/Ag Clack; Attorney for Appellant: Davis; District Judge Lamberth; Attorney for Appellee: Lorber; clerk - Originating Clerk/Ag Clack; Attorney for Appellant: Davis; District Judge Lamberth; Attorney for Appellee: Lorber [19-50656] (Pamela Joy Andasola ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:31 PM]

Open Document #4

Transcript Order Form

Open Document #1

Reptr-1 Letter

Open Document

No Description Available

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend the time for filing the transcript and waive discount filed by Ms. Pamela Joy Andasola [ # 9138451-2 ] Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 09/26/2019 for Pamela Joy Andasola, Court Reporter [19-50656] (MFY) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Kristin Marie Anderson, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 08/27/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-50656] (LLL) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Chris Poage, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 09/05/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-50656] (CBW) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION OF COURT REPORTER filed by Ms. Pamela Joy Andasola to extend the time for filing the transcript until 09/26/2019 and to waive the discount date [9138451-2]. Date of Service: 09/05/2019 via email - Court Reporter Andasola; Originating Clerk/Ag Clack; Attorney for Appellant: Davis; District Judge Lamberth; Attorney for Appellee: Lorber; clerk - Originating Clerk/Ag Clack; Attorney for Appellant: Davis; District Judge Lamberth; Attorney for Appellee: Lorber [19-50656] (Pamela Joy Andasola ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50656] (Chris Poage ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 09/01/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-50656] (CCR) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Ms. Margaret Agredano is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50656] (Gigi Simcox ) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 08/26/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-50656] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-50656] (Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Melissa Lorber for party(s) Appellee State Farm Lloyds, in case 19-50656 [19-50656] (RSM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox, Est. Completion Dt: 09/05/2019, Est. No.of Pgs: 52, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 08/06/2019, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 09/05/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 02/02/2018. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 09/05/2019 for Gigi Simcox [19-50656] (LLL) [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jennifer Gibbins Durbin for party(s) Appellee State Farm Lloyds, in case 19-50656 [19-50656] (CBW) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Gigi Simcox. [19-50656] (Gigi Simcox ) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50656] (Jennifer Gibbins Durbin ) [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Kristin Marie Anderson, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 02/02/2018; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 02/02/2018; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Pamela Joy Andasola, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Selection/Jury Trial 02/20/2018; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Chris Poage, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Trial 02/21/2018; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Leticia L. Ornelas Rangel, Proceeding Type and Date: Jury Trial 02/22/2018. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 08/09/2019 for Pamela Andasola, Court Reporter, Kristin Anderson, Court Reporter, Leticia Ornelas Rangel, Court Reporter, Chris Poage, Court Reporter and Gigi Simcox. Electronic Filing Processed. [ # 9107836-2 ] [19-50656] (RLL) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredanofor the Court to process. Date of service: 07/29/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Davis; Attorney for Appellee: Willis. [19-50656] (Joshua P. Davis ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joshua P. Davis for Appellant Margaret Agredano in 19-50656, Attorney Joshua P. Davis for Appellant Jesus Agredano in 19-50656 [19-50656] (CB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joshua P. Davis for Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50656] (Joshua P. Davis ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9103291-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/07/2019 for Appellants Jesus Agredano and Margaret Agredano [19-50656] (CB) [Entered: 07/23/2019 07:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Jesus Agredano and Ms. Margaret Agredano [19-50656] (RSM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.