Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 06:19:00 (UTC).

Jesuale, et al v. Evans, et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Jesuale filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Evans. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1298

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

DAVID J. JESUALE FAMILY TRUST

JOANNE JESUALE

Defendant / Appellants

JDEVANS GROUP, LLC, DBA The Law Office of James D. Evans

JAMES D. EVANS, DBA James D. Evans Law Office

JAMES DONIVAN EVANS, P.C., DBA The James Donivan Evans Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Wadi Muhaisen

Attorney at Muhaisen & Muhaisen

2020 S Parker Rd, Unit L

Denver, CO 80231

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Richard L. Merpi II

Attorney at Childs McCune

821 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Daniel Ray McCune Esq.

Attorney at Kennedy Childs P.C.

633 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2200

Denver, CO 80202-3661

Daniel Ray McCune

Attorney at Childs McCune

821 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Jennifer R. Lake

Attorney at Childs McCune

821 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10779738] Entry of appearance filed by Jennifer R. Lake for James Donivan Evans, P.C., JDEVANS Group, LLC and James D. Evans. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] [Entered: 10/20/2020 09:38 AM]

Open Document #2

Appendix Volume II, Pages APL.A 283-468

Open Document #1

Appendix Volume I

Open Document #2

[24] Order - Case Remanded to Denver County District Court

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10771046] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on its own initiative following review of appellants' docketing statement and the district court's docket. The court directs the parties to address with specificity in their briefs whether this court has jurisdiction to review the district court's order remanding the case underlying this appeal to state court: The court will not decide its jurisdiction to review the remand order at this time. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 09/17/2020. [20-1298] [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:46 AM]

Open Document

[10768801] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel Ray McCune for James D. Evans, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1298] [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:20 AM]

Open Document

[10768618] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. Transcript ordered: Served on: 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:43 PM]

Open Document

[10768489] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Wadi Muhaisen for Joanne Jesuale and David J. Jesuale Family Trust. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:18 PM]

Open Document

[10768214] Docketing statement filed by James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. Served on 09/04/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket[10779750] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellants is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices). Paper copies of appellants' brief and appendix brief due 10/27/2020 by James D. Evans, JDEVANS Group, LLC and James Donivan Evans, P.C. Appellees' brief due 11/18/2020 for Joanne Jesuale and David J. Jesuale Family Trust. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1298] [Entered: 10/20/2020 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10779738] Entry of appearance filed by Jennifer R. Lake for James Donivan Evans, P.C., JDEVANS Group, LLC and James D. Evans. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] [Entered: 10/20/2020 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10779609] Appellant's appendix filed by James D. Evans, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10779608] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by James D. Evans, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. Served on 10/19/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket[10779602] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer R. Lake for Appellants James D. Evans, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/20/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1298] JRL [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771046] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on its own initiative following review of appellants' docketing statement and the district court's docket. The court directs the parties to address with specificity in their briefs whether this court has jurisdiction to review the district court's order remanding the case underlying this appeal to state court: The court will not decide its jurisdiction to review the remand order at this time. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 09/17/2020. [20-1298] [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket[10768859] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/09/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/19/2020 for James D. Evans, JDEVANS Group, LLC and James Donivan Evans, P.C.. Text entry only from district court notice. [20-1298] [Entered: 09/09/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10768801] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel Ray McCune for James D. Evans, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1298] [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket[10768621] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/15/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1298] [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10768618] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. Transcript ordered: Served on: 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket[10768606] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel R. McCune for Appellants James D. Evans, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 09/09/2020 by JJH to remove pdf as filed 09/08/20] [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10768489] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Wadi Muhaisen for Joanne Jesuale and David J. Jesuale Family Trust. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket[10768437] Entry of appearance submitted by Wadi Muhaisen for Appellees David J. Jesuale Family Trust and Joanne Jesuale for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/08/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1298] WM [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10768214] Docketing statement filed by James Donivan Evans, P.C. and JDEVANS Group, LLC. Served on 09/04/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1298] DRM [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10764956] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/24/2020. Docketing statement due 09/08/2020 for James D. Evans, JDEVANDS Group, LLC and James Donivan Evans, P.C.. Transcript order form due 09/08/2020 for James D. Evans, JDEVANDS Group, LLC and James Donivan Evans, P.C.. Notice of appearance due on 09/08/2020 for David J. Jesuale Family Trust, James D. Evans, JDEVANDS Group, LLC, James Donivan Evans, P.C. and Joanne Jesuale [20-1298] [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L. Merpi II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Ray McCune