This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/21/2020 at 06:13:45 (UTC).

Jessica Tischer v. Union Pacific Railroad Compan

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Jessica Tischer filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Compan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3071

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

JESSICA TISCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan B. Amarilio

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP

111 E. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Thomas A.P. Hayden

Attorney at UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

101 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

J. Timothy Eaton

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP

111 E. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul Anthony Banker

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE & KVAS, P.A.

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive

Wayzata, MN 55391

Richard Leonard Carlson

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE & KVAS, P.A.

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive

Wayzata, MN 55391

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Timothy Eaton on behalf of Thomas A. Hayden for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [11] [7123860] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-3071] (Eaton, J.) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:25 PM]

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Timothy Eaton on behalf of Brody E. Dawson for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [10] [7123822] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-3071] (Eaton, J.) [Entered: 11/24/2020 12:42 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/29/2021 for Jessica Tischer. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/15/2021 for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/05/2021 for Appellant Jessica Tischer. JB [7122322] [20-3071] (FP) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:47 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2020 for Jessica Tischer. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/15/2021 for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/05/2021 for Appellant Jessica Tischer. JB [7118051] [20-3071] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:09 PM]

#7

(#7) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, November 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [7] [7118045] [20-3071] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:07 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jonathan B. Amarilio for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [6] [7117975] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] [6] [7117975] [20-3071]--[Edited 10/28/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Amarilio, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:08 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Timothy Eaton for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [5] [7117973] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] [5] [7117973] [20-3071]--[Edited 10/28/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Eaton, J.) [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:02 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Richard L. Carlson for Appellant Jessica Tischer. [4] [7117173] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] [Edited 10/26/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Carlson, Richard) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:13 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul Banker for Appellant Jessica Tischer. [3] [7117166] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] (Banker, Paul) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:00 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jessica Tischer. [2] [7117164] [20-3071] (Banker, Paul) [Entered: 10/26/2020 08:56 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Timothy Eaton on behalf of Thomas A. Hayden for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [11] [7123860] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-3071] (Eaton, J.) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Timothy Eaton on behalf of Brody E. Dawson for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [10] [7123822] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-3071] (Eaton, J.) [Entered: 11/24/2020 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/29/2021 for Jessica Tischer. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/15/2021 for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/05/2021 for Appellant Jessica Tischer. JB [7122322] [20-3071] (FP) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2020 for Jessica Tischer. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/15/2021 for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/05/2021 for Appellant Jessica Tischer. JB [7118051] [20-3071] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, November 16, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [7] [7118045] [20-3071] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jonathan B. Amarilio for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [6] [7117975] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] [6] [7117975] [20-3071]--[Edited 10/28/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Amarilio, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney J. Timothy Eaton for Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company. [5] [7117973] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] [5] [7117973] [20-3071]--[Edited 10/28/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Eaton, J.) [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Richard L. Carlson for Appellant Jessica Tischer. [4] [7117173] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] [Edited 10/26/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Carlson, Richard) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul Banker for Appellant Jessica Tischer. [3] [7117166] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3071] (Banker, Paul) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jessica Tischer. [2] [7117164] [20-3071] (Banker, Paul) [Entered: 10/26/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/05/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/01/2020 for Jessica Tischer. [1] [7116945] [20-3071] (ZNS) [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L Carlson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Anthony Banker