This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

Jessica Littlejohn, et al v. Ferrara Candy Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Jessica Littlejohn filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ferrara Candy Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55805

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

JESSICA LITTLEJOHN, on behalf of herself, all others similarly situated, and the general public

Not Yet Classified

JAMES COPLAND

Defendant / Appellee

FERRARA CANDY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Houchin

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald A. Marron

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Ronald A. Marron

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald A. Marron

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Theodore H. Frank

Attorney at Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute

1629 K Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kelley B. Harrington

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Neal Potischman Esquire

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant James Copland Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372545] [19-55805] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:18 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11379340] (VS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:20 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11379340] (VS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11372557][19-55805] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant James Copland Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11372545] [19-55805] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/12/2019. Transcript due 09/09/2019. Appellant James Copland opening brief due 10/21/2019. Appellees Ferrara Candy Company and Jessica Littlejohn answering brief due 11/21/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364077] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.