This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 06:04:04 (UTC).

Jerry Wood v. Kevin Young, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Jerry Wood filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kevin Young. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35791

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

BURNS, MHP

ANTHONY ASTON

DAN STITES, Captain

MCKENNEY, Officer

KIMBERLY PARKER, Classification Supervisor

Defendant / Appellees

TAYLOR, MHP Lead

MATHEW BALDOCK, Snohomish County Prosecutor

KEVIN YOUNG

DANIEL YOUNG, Sergeant

MERKEL, MHP

Plaintiff / Appellant

JERRY GEORGE WOOD

Everett, WA 98201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Katherine Heather Bosch

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Michael C. Held

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jerry George Wood

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY JAIL

3025 Oakes Avenue

Everett, WA 98201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Filed Appellant Jerry George Wood motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11487076] (NAC) [Entered: 11/04/2019 07:59 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Mathew Baldock, Merkel, Taylor, Daniel Young and Kevin Young Correspondence: Declaration of service. Date of service: 10/16/2019. [11466667] [19-35791] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 10/16/2019 by TYL] (Bosch, Katherine) [Entered: 10/16/2019 03:04 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees Mathew Baldock, Merkel, Taylor, Daniel Young and Kevin Young response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 10/14/2019. [11463164] [19-35791] (Bosch, Katherine) [Entered: 10/14/2019 03:30 PM]

5 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Jerry George Wood motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11454809] (NAC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:07 PM]

#3

(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 10/01/2019. [11454781] (NAC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:55 PM]

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11435493] (CKP) [Entered: 09/18/2019 10:48 AM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed Appellant Jerry George Wood motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11487076] (NAC) [Entered: 11/04/2019 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Mathew Baldock, Merkel, Taylor, Daniel Young and Kevin Young Correspondence: Declaration of service. Date of service: 10/16/2019. [11466667] [19-35791] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 10/16/2019 by TYL] (Bosch, Katherine) [Entered: 10/16/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees Mathew Baldock, Merkel, Taylor, Daniel Young and Kevin Young response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 10/14/2019. [11463164] [19-35791] (Bosch, Katherine) [Entered: 10/14/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11456245] (CKP) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Jerry George Wood motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11454809] (NAC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 10/01/2019. [11454781] (NAC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11435493] (CKP) [Entered: 09/18/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jerry George Wood opening brief due 11/12/2019. Appellees Mathew Baldock, Merkel, Taylor, Daniel Young and Kevin Young answering brief due 12/12/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11432354] (JPD) [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCKENNEY, Officer is a litigant