Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2021 at 06:26:54 (UTC).

Jerry Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Sec.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Jerry Wilson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Sec. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10278

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JERRY WILSON

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Steinberg

Attorney at Michael A. Steinberg & Associates

4925 Independence Pkwy Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33634-7550

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Megan Elizabeth Gideon

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Joseph Paul Palermo III

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Sarah Carroll

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw Rm 3706, Po Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044

Charles W. Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Attorney General's Office

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Arthurice Tylune Brundidge

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Jerry Wilson is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9322617-3 ] [Entered: 03/03/2021 06:55 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Jerry Wilson failed to file a Transcript Order Form within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 02/25/2021 11:19 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #4

USDC Judgment- doc #38

Open Restricted Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Restricted Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Jerry Wilson. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/12/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 03/03/2021 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Jerry Wilson is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9322617-3 ] [Entered: 03/03/2021 06:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Michael A. Steinberg for Appellant Jerry Wilson. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-10278] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and Reinstate Case filed by Jerry Wilson. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9322617-1] [21-10278] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 03/02/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Jerry Wilson failed to file a Transcript Order Form within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 02/25/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellee Commissioner of Social Security. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10278] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles W. Scarborough for the Social Security Adminisration [21-10278] (ECF: Charles Scarborough) [Entered: 02/15/2021 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Carroll for Commissioner of Social Security [21-10278] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph Palermo for SSA [21-10278] (ECF: Joseph Palermo) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arthurice Brundidge for SSA [21-10278] (ECF: Arthurice Brundidge) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Megan Gideon for SSA [21-10278] (ECF: Megan Gideon) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Steinberg for Appellant Jerry Wilson. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10278] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael A. Steinberg for Appellant Jerry Wilson. [21-10278] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Steinberg for Jerry Wilson. [21-10278] (ECF: Michael Steinberg) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Jerry Wilson was filed on 06/28/2019. Docket Entry 7. [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jerry Wilson on 01/25/2021. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/09/2021 as to Appellant Jerry Wilson. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/23/2021 as to Appellee Commissioner of Social Security [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arthurice Tylune Brundidge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Paul Palermo III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Carroll