This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2019 at 06:04:26 (UTC).

Jerry Hendricks v. DOJ

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 Jerry Hendricks filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against DOJ. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1196

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

JERRY L. HENDRICKS

Springfield, MO 65801-4000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Greggory R. Walters

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

211 Fulton Street, One Technology Plaza

Peoria, IL 61602-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jerry L. Hendricks

Attorney at MEDICAL CENTER FOR FEDERAL PRISONERS

P.O. Box 4000

Springfield, MO 65801-4000

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Filed PLRA memorandum from Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks. [6] [6986845] [19-1083, 19-1196] (CAG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:13 PM]

#1

Civil Rights Case

#5

(#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Greggory R. Walters for Appellee DOJ in 19-1083, 19-1196. [4] [6982161] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1083, 19-1196]-[Edited 02/05/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Walters, Greggory) [Entered: 02/05/2019 09:02 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6981221] [19-1196] (CAG) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:48 AM]

#4

(#3) ORDER: Appellant Jerry Lee Hendricks has filed two notices of appeal from the same underlying district court action. Appeal no. 19-1196 purports to appeal from the denial of a motion to reconsider, and is considered an amended notice of appeal from appeal no. 19-1083. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(i), (ii). Accordingly, no additional fee is required for appeal no. 19-1196. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(iii). SCR [3] [6981658] [19-1196] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:37 PM]

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#5

(#5) ORDER: Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks by 02/25/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0557. JR [5] [6983445] [19-1196] (MM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:46 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed PLRA memorandum from Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks. [6] [6986845] [19-1083, 19-1196] (CAG) [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks by 02/25/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0557. JR [5] [6983445] [19-1196] (MM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Appearance form filed by Attorney Greggory R. Walters for Appellee DOJ in 19-1083, 19-1196. [4] [6982161] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1083, 19-1196]-[Edited 02/05/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Walters, Greggory) [Entered: 02/05/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Appellant Jerry Lee Hendricks has filed two notices of appeal from the same underlying district court action. Appeal no. 19-1196 purports to appeal from the denial of a motion to reconsider, and is considered an amended notice of appeal from appeal no. 19-1083. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(i), (ii). Accordingly, no additional fee is required for appeal no. 19-1196. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(iii). SCR [3] [6981658] [19-1196] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6981221] [19-1196] (CAG) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Federal prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jerry L. Hendricks by 02/04/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 02/14/2019. [1] [6981214] [19-1196] (CAG) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.