This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 06:05:41 (UTC).

Jerome Kidd v. Commissioner Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Jerome Kidd filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1068

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEROME C. KIDD

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Alan H. Polonsky Esq.

Attorney at Polonsky & Polonsky

512 South White Horse Pike

Audubon, NJ 08106

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jordana Cooper Esq.

Attorney at Social Security Administration

300 Spring Garden Street, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19123

Andrew C. Lynch Esq.

Attorney at Social Security Administration

300 Spring Garden Street, 6Th Floor, P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19123

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Case Opening Letter

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #5

ORDER

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

STANDING ORDER

Open Document #1

Standing Order

Open Restricted Document #6

OPINION

Open Restricted Document #2

Case Caption

Open Restricted Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jerome C. Kidd due on or before 04/08/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/08/2019.. (PDB) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jerome C. Kidd advising this court that. [19-1068] (AHP) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Alan H. Polonsky, Esq. for Jerome C. Kidd requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/12/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jerome C. Kidd, filed. [19-1068] (AHP) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan H. Polonsky on behalf of Appellant(s) Jerome C. Kidd. [19-1068] (AHP) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Alan H. Polonsky, Esq. for Jerome C. Kidd requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/19/2019. Information Statement on or before 02/19/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 02/19/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jordana Cooper on behalf of Appellee(s) Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. [19-1068] (JC) [Entered: 02/04/2019 06:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jerome C. Kidd in District Court No. 3-18-cv-05626. (LMR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.