This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2019 at 06:06:33 (UTC).

Jerold Griffin v. City of Sugarland, Texas, et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Jerold Griffin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Sugarland, Texas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20198

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

M. SHOCKEY

CITY OF SUGARLAND, TEXAS

L. JONES

J. YOUNG

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEROLD GRIFFIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William S. Helfand

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Norman Ray Giles

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Randall Lee Kallinen Esq.

Attorney at Law Office of Randall L. Kallinen, P.L.L.C.

511 Broadway Street

Houston, TX 77012

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Attorney Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin is advised to submit a proper DKT-5A form for appearance of counsel. [19-20198] (LBM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 05:17 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The revised Notice of Appearance Form must be used. [19-20198] (BPL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:54 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin [19-20198] (SMC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:09 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:17 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-20198] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 04/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Helfand; Attorney for Appellant: Kallinen [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:37 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Jerold Griffin. [19-20198] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:35 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9022638-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20198] (SMC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 08:47 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin for filing Appellant's Brief until 06/19/2019 [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:33 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William S. Helfand for City of Sugarland, Texas, Mr. L. Jones, Mr. M. Shockey and Mr. J. Young for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/11/2019 06:24 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The revised Notice of Appearance Form must be used. [19-20198] (BF) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20198] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:01 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin. Extension Granted to and including 06/19/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/19/2019 for Appellant Jerold Griffin [19-20198] (DMS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin for filing Appellant's Brief until 06/19/2019 [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Randall Lee Kallinen for Appellant Jerold Griffin in 19-20198 [19-20198] (RLL) [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellee L. Jones in 19-20198, Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellee M. Shockey in 19-20198, Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellee J. Young in 19-20198, Attorney William S. Helfand for Appellee City of Sugarland, Texas in 19-20198 [19-20198] (DMS) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Norman Ray Giles for party(s) Appellee L. Jones Appellee City of Sugarland, Texas Appellee M. Shockey Appellee J. Young, in case 19-20198 [19-20198] (DMS) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20198] (Norman Ray Giles ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William S. Helfand for City of Sugarland, Texas, Mr. L. Jones, Mr. M. Shockey and Mr. J. Young for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (William S. Helfand ) [Entered: 04/15/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The revised Notice of Appearance Form must be used. [19-20198] (BPL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The revised Notice of Appearance Form must be used. [19-20198] (BF) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/11/2019 06:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin is advised to submit a proper DKT-5A form for appearance of counsel. [19-20198] (LBM) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-20198] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 04/10/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Helfand; Attorney for Appellant: Kallinen [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Randall Lee Kallinen, Esq. for Mr. Jerold Griffin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20198] (Randall Lee Kallinen ) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Jerold Griffin. [19-20198] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20198] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-3121. Electronic ROA due on 04/22/2019. [19-20198] (SMC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9022638-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20198] (SMC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jerold Griffin [19-20198] (SMC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.