Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 06:14:03 (UTC).

Jeremy Wolfson v. Bank of America, N.A., et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Jeremy Wolfson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bank of America, N A . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35792

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC.

MTC FINANCIAL, INC.

MAROON HOLDING, LLC

FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORPORATION, an Arizona corporation

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

INTERCONTINENTAL EXCHANGE, INC.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors in interest and/or Assigns;

DOES, 1-10, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEREMY WOLFSON

Puyallup, WA 98374

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel J. Gibbons

Attorney at Witherspoon Kelley

422 W. Riverside Avenue, Suite 1100

Spokane, WA 99201

Michael Steven DeLeo Esquire

Attorney at Peterson Russell Kelly, PLLC

10900 N.E. Fourth Street

Bellevue, WA 98004

Frederick B. Burnside Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Frederick Haist Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Frederick A. Haist Esquire

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Jan T. Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson APC

One Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kerry W. Franich

Attorney at Severson & Werson, APC

19100 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeremy Wolfson

16208 132Nd Ave East

Puyallup, WA 98374

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Jeremy Wolfson Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/10/2021. Date of service: 11/03/2020. [11880905] [20-35792] (Wolfson, Jeremy) [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:08 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. and Maroon Holding, LLC reply to response (motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, ). Date of service: 10/22/2020. [11868320] [20-35792] (Haist, Frederick) [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:42 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Jeremy Wolfson response to motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/16/2020. [11862174] [20-35792] (Wolfson, Jeremy) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:04 PM]

7 #2

Additional Document

7 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Jeremy Wolfson Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/10/2021. Date of service: 11/03/2020. [11880905] [20-35792] (Wolfson, Jeremy) [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. and Maroon Holding, LLC reply to response (motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, ). Date of service: 10/22/2020. [11868320] [20-35792] (Haist, Frederick) [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Jeremy Wolfson response to motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/16/2020. [11862174] [20-35792] (Wolfson, Jeremy) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. and Maroon Holding, LLC Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11825713] [20-35792] (Haist, Frederick) [Entered: 09/16/2020 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Jan T. Chilton for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A. Appellee MERS, in case 20-35792. [11820040] (NAC) [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jan T. Chilton (Severson & Werson, One Embarcadero Center, 26th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111) for Appellees Bank of America, N.A. and MERS. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11819993] [20-35792] (Chilton, Jan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Kerry W. Franich for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A. Appellee MERS, in case 20-35792. [11819990] (NAC) [Entered: 09/11/2020 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kerry W. Franich (Severson & Werson 19100 Von Karman Ave, #700, Irvine, CA 92612) for Appellees Bank of America, N.A. and MERS. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11819976] [20-35792] (Franich, Kerry) [Entered: 09/11/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Added Attorney(s) Frederick B. Burnside for party(s) Appellee Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. Appellee Maroon Holding, LLC, in case 20-35792. [11818883] (RT) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jeremy Wolfson opening brief due 11/12/2020. Appellees Bank of America, N.A., Does, First Magnus Financial Corporation, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., MTC Financial, Inc., Maroon Holding, LLC, Merscorp Holdings, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. answering brief due 12/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11817764] (RT) [Entered: 09/09/2020 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST MAGNUS FINANCIAL CORP. A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MERSCORP is a litigant

Latest cases where FHB INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MTC FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant