This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/27/2022 at 07:32:02 (UTC).

Jeremy White v. Aldridge Electric Inc

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Jeremy White filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Aldridge Electric Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1798

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEREMY WHITE

Defendant / Appellee

ALDRIDGE ELECTRIC INC, DBA Aldridge Electric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Allison A. Barker Esq.

Attorney at Karpf Karpf & Cerutti

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Jeremy M. Cerutti Esq.

Attorney at Karpf Karpf & Cerutti

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Ari R. Karpf Esq.

Attorney at Karpf Karpf & Cerutti

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jacob M. Sitman Esq.

Attorney at Fitzpatrick Lentz & Bubba

645 Hamilton Street, Suite 800

Allentown, PA 18101

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Order

1 #3

Memorandum

1 #4

Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Allison A. Barker, Esq., Jeremy M. Cerutti, Esq., Ari R. Karpf, Esq., Jacob M. Sitman, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 05/12/2022. (SLC) [Entered: 04/28/2022 02:57 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeremy M. Cerutti, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:41 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:42 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:44 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:45 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jeremy White advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:46 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob M. Sitman, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Aldridge Electric, Inc. d/b/a Aldridge Electric. [22-1798] (JMS) [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:23 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Aldridge Electric Inc. [22-1798] (JMS) [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:27 PM]

11 #1

Mediation Instructions

11 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 05/09/2022 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Aldridge Electric Inc. [22-1798] (JMS) [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jacob M. Sitman, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Aldridge Electric, Inc. d/b/a Aldridge Electric. [22-1798] (JMS) [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jeremy White advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeremy M. Cerutti, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Jeremy White. [22-1798] (JMC) [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Allison A. Barker, Esq., Jeremy M. Cerutti, Esq., Ari R. Karpf, Esq., Jacob M. Sitman, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 05/12/2022. (SLC) [Entered: 04/28/2022 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 04/28/2022 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jeremy White in District Court No. 5-21-cv-01872. (SLC) [Entered: 04/28/2022 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDRIDGE ELECTRIC, INC. is a litigant