This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:07:06 (UTC).

Jeremiah Balik v. City of Torrance, et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Jeremiah Balik filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Torrance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15655

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

NEVADA HIGHWAY PATROL

CITY OF TORRANCE

CITY OF CHICAGO

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

VALVOLINE INC.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

FRED S. UPTON FOUNDATION

CITY OF CEDAR FALLS

BRISTOL FARMS

SAN DIEGO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

NEXT GENERATION WIRELESS

CITY OF SAN BERNADINO

SANTA BARBARA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPT.

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS

Plaintiff / Appellant

JEREMIAH W. BALIK

Las Vegas, NV 89131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Terry Allen Coffing Esquire

Attorney at Marquis Aurbach Coffing

10001 Park Run Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeremiah W. Balik

6440 Sky Pointe Drive, 275

Las Vegas, NV 89131

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MANDATE ISSUED. (DFO, WAF and PJW) [11299609] (RL) [Entered: 05/16/2019 09:12 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#5

(#5) Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: Case Closed. Served on 04/25/2019. [11282700] (RL) [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:54 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/07/2019. [11260515] (RL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:22 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and PAUL J. WATFORD) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal of the magistrate judges April 1, 2019 order denying appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court without prejudice to filing a long form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Because the district judge has not entered a final order regarding appellants in forma pauperis status in the district court, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; see also In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable); Tripati v. Rison, 847 F.2d 548 (9th Cir. 1988) (absent consent of all parties, magistrate judge lacks authority to issue dispositive order denying in forma pauperis status). All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the district court. DISMISSED. [11275982] (OC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:11 PM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from appellant Jeremiah Balik. [11259296] (RL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:54 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MANDATE ISSUED. (DFO, WAF and PJW) [11299609] (RL) [Entered: 05/16/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: Case Closed. Served on 04/25/2019. [11282700] (RL) [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and PAUL J. WATFORD) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal of the magistrate judges April 1, 2019 order denying appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court without prejudice to filing a long form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Because the district judge has not entered a final order regarding appellants in forma pauperis status in the district court, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; see also In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable); Tripati v. Rison, 847 F.2d 548 (9th Cir. 1988) (absent consent of all parties, magistrate judge lacks authority to issue dispositive order denying in forma pauperis status). All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the district court. DISMISSED. [11275982] (OC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/07/2019. [11260515] (RL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jeremiah W. Balik opening brief due 06/03/2019. Appellees Bristol Farms, California Highway Patrol, City of Cedar Falls, City of Chicago, City of Citrus Heights, City of Los Angeles, City of Manhattan Beach, City of San Bernadino, City of Torrance, Fred S. Upton Foundation, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, Nevada Highway Patrol, Next Generation Wireless, San Diego County Sheriff's Department, Santa Barbara County Sheriff's Dept. and Valvoline Inc. answering brief due 07/03/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11255607] (JPD) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from appellant Jeremiah Balik. [11259296] (RL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less