This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/27/2020 at 06:08:17 (UTC).

Jennifer Reno v. Allstate Property and Casualty

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Jennifer Reno filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Property and Casualty. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3107

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JENNIFER RENO

Defendant / Appellee

ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John F. Mayer

Attorney at MAYER, GRAFF & WALLACE, LLP

1425 Memorial Drive

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Alison E. Kliner

Attorney at BORGELT, POWELL, PETERSON & FRAUEN

1243 N. Tenth Street

Milwaukee, WI 53205

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [9] JNS [7126309] [20-3107] (FP) [Entered: 12/07/2020 11:38 AM]

#7

(#7) Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jennifer Reno. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7121455] [20-3107] (Mayer, John) [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:50 AM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff-appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information noted in this order. The statement is due on or before November 19, 2020. (See order for further details) DW [6] [7121353] [20-3107] (AG) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:36 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jennifer Reno. [5] [7121224] [20-3107] (Mayer, John) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:59 AM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jennifer Reno. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7121162] [20-3107] (Mayer, John) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:14 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/14/2020 for Jennifer Reno. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/13/2021 for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/03/2021 for Appellant Jennifer Reno. JNS [7118502] [20-3107] (AD) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:57 AM]

#2

(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thrusday, November 12, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [2] [7118498] [20-3107] (AD) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:53 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [9] JNS [7126309] [20-3107] (FP) [Entered: 12/07/2020 11:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney John F. Mayer for Appellant Jennifer Reno has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [8] [7125171] [20-3107] (LJ) [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jennifer Reno. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7121455] [20-3107] (Mayer, John) [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff-appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information noted in this order. The statement is due on or before November 19, 2020. (See order for further details) DW [6] [7121353] [20-3107] (AG) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jennifer Reno. [5] [7121224] [20-3107] (Mayer, John) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jennifer Reno. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7121162] [20-3107] (Mayer, John) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/14/2020 for Jennifer Reno. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/13/2021 for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/03/2021 for Appellant Jennifer Reno. JNS [7118502] [20-3107] (AD) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thrusday, November 12, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [2] [7118498] [20-3107] (AD) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 11/12/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jennifer Reno by 11/04/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2020 for Jennifer Reno. [1] [7118036] [20-3107] (FP) [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant