This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/22/2021 at 06:00:53 (UTC).

Jennifer Miller v. Michael Anderson, et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Jennifer Miller filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Michael Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3854

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

 

Party Details

Defendant

MICHAEL J. ANDERSON, et al.

Plaintiff / Appellee

JENNIFER L. MILLER, Derivatively on behalf of other FirstEnergy Corporation

Intervenor / Appellees

LOCAL 103, ELECTRICAL WORKERS PENSION FUND, I.B.E.W.

EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF ST. LOUIS

MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS PENSION FUND

ELECTRICAL WORKERS PENSION FUND, LOCAL 103, I.B.E.W.

Defendant / Appellants

FIRST ENERGY CORPORATION, Nominal Defendant

FIRSTENERGY CORP., Nominal Defendant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Alan L. Rosca

Attorney at Goldman Scarlato & Penny

23250 Chagrin Boulevard, Suite 100

Beachwood, OH 44122

Intervenor / Appellee Attorneys

Jeroen Van Kwawegen

Attorney at Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 44Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

John C. Camillus

Attorney at Law Offices

P.O. Box 141410

Columbus, OH 43214

Thomas Curry

Attorney at Saxena White

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Donald W. Davis Jr.

Attorney at Brennan, Manna & Diamond

75 E. Market Street

Akron, OH 44308

Amy R. Miller

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Sellers & Toll

88 Pine Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Alla Zayenchik

Attorney at Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossmann

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 44Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

John Gleeson

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Kerin Lyn Kaminski

Attorney at Giffen & Kaminski

1300 E. Ninth Street, Suite 1600

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kathleen A. Nitschke

Attorney at Giffen & Kaminski

1300 E. Ninth Street, Suite 1600

Cleveland, OH 44114

Maeve O'Connor

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. by Alla Zayenchik. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3854] (AZ) [Entered: 11/16/2021 04:16 PM]

#28

(#28) MOTION filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp. to consolidate cases 21-4037, In re FirstEnergy Corp., 21-4041, In re FirstEnergy Corp.., 21-3993, Empl. Ret. Sys. of St. Louis v. Jones, et al., to expedite briefing schedule, to stay district court proceeding. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:13 PM]

#27

(#27) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis by Thomas Curry. Certificate of Service: 11/10/2021. [21-3854] (TC) [Entered: 11/10/2021 01:30 PM]

#26

(#26) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. by Kerin Lyn Kaminski. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2021. [21-3854] (KLK) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:26 AM]

#25

(#25) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. by Kathleen A. Nitschke. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2021. [21-3854] (KAN) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:24 AM]

#24

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

#21

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #4

Additional Document

#3

Additional Document

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

motion to dismiss

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. by Alla Zayenchik. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3854] (AZ) [Entered: 11/16/2021 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION filed by Mr. John Gleeson for FirstEnergy Corp. to consolidate cases 21-4037, In re FirstEnergy Corp., 21-4041, In re FirstEnergy Corp.., 21-3993, Empl. Ret. Sys. of St. Louis v. Jones, et al., to expedite briefing schedule, to stay district court proceeding. Certificate of Service: 11/16/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis by Thomas Curry. Certificate of Service: 11/10/2021. [21-3854] (TC) [Entered: 11/10/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. by Kerin Lyn Kaminski. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2021. [21-3854] (KLK) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant FirstEnergy Corp. by Kathleen A. Nitschke. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2021. [21-3854] (KAN) [Entered: 11/08/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY filed by Honorable John Gleeson for First Energy Corporation regarding Motion in Support of Expedited Briefing Schedule Certificate of Service: 10/12/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 10/12/2021 11:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) **LOCKED**RESPONSE in support filed regarding a motion to dismiss - jurisdiction, [ # 3 ]; previously filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W., Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. Response from Attorney Mr. John C. Camillus for Appellees Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2021. [21-3854]-Clerical error, correctly filed as RE #22.--[Edited 10/12/2021 by SSS] (JCC) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund regarding motion to dismiss Certificate of Service: 10/12/2021. [21-3854]--[Edited 10/12/2021 by SSS] (JCC) [Entered: 10/12/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. by Jeroen van Kwawegen. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2021. [21-3854] (JV) [Entered: 10/08/2021 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by Amy Miller. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2021. [21-3854] (ARM) [Entered: 10/08/2021 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant First Energy Corporation by Maeve O'Connor. Certificate of Service: 10/04/2021. [21-3854] (MO) [Entered: 10/04/2021 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Honorable John Gleeson for First Energy Corporation. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 09/30/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION filed by Honorable John Gleeson for First Energy Corporation to expedite briefing schedule. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 09/25/2021 12:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Honorable John Gleeson for Appellant First Energy Corporation.. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 09/25/2021 12:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Honorable John Gleeson for Appellant First Energy Corporation Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 09/25/2021 12:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant First Energy Corporation by John Gleeson. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3854] (JG) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund by John Camillus. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2021. [21-3854] (JCC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION filed by Mr. John C. Camillus for Employees Retirement System of the City of St. Louis, Local 103, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. and Massachusetts Laborers Pension Fund to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-3854] (JCC) [Entered: 09/23/2021 11:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 09/23/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant First Energy Corporation. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 09/23/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W. is a litigant

Latest cases where Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maeve O'Connor Esq.