This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/20/2022 at 06:08:43 (UTC).

Jennifer Miller, et al v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Jennifer Miller, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-36048

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

JENNIFER MILLER

EMAD AL-KAHLOUT

JOSE GRINAN

KELLY KIMMEY

JUMA LAWSON

HAMADY BOCOUM

PHILIP SULLIVAN

KIMBERLY HALO

CHRISTOPHER CAIN

GARY GLEESE

CLARENCE HARDEN

STEVEN MORIHARA

SHARON PASCHAL

Defendant / Appellants

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON LOGISTICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Toby J. Marshall

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC

936 North 34Th Street

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Jennifer Rust Murray

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC

936 North 34Th Street, Suite 300

Seattle, WA 98103

Hillary Schwab

Attorney at Fair Work, PC

192 South Street, Suite 450

Boston, MA 02111

Beth Ellen Terrell

Attorney at Terrell Marshall Law Group PLLC

936 North 34Th Street, Suite 300

Seattle, WA 98103

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael E. Kenneally

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kenneth E. Payson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

920 5Th Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Michael J. Puma

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Richard G. Rosenblatt Esquire

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540-6241

Sheehan Sullivan

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

920 5Th Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Logistics, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/29/2021. [12326832] [21-36048] (Kenneally, Michael) [Entered: 12/29/2021 09:24 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL IN AssessmentConference, 02/01/2022, 1:00 p.m.,PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12336966] (LW) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:57 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is reset as follows: appellants' opening brief is due July 27, 2022; appellees' answering brief is due August 26, 2022; appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12358192] (SB) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:19 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is reset as follows: appellants' opening brief is due July 27, 2022; appellees' answering brief is due August 26, 2022; appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12358192] (SB) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL IN AssessmentConference, 02/01/2022, 1:00 p.m.,PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12336966] (LW) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/29/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12327098]. [21-36048] (AD) [Entered: 12/29/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Logistics, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/29/2021. [12326832] [21-36048] (Kenneally, Michael) [Entered: 12/29/2021 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/29/2021. Transcript ordered by 01/21/2022. Transcript due 02/22/2022. Appellants Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc. opening brief due 04/01/2022. Appellees Emad Al-Kahlout, Hamady Bocoum, Christopher Cain, Gary Gleese, Jose Grinan, Kimberly Halo, Clarence Harden, Kelly Kimmey, Juma Lawson, Jennifer Miller, Steven Morihara, Sharon Paschal and Philip Sullivan answering brief due 05/02/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12323621] (JBS) [Entered: 12/22/2021 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheehan H Sullivan