This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/27/2021 at 05:14:30 (UTC).

Jenam Tech, LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Jenam Tech, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1085

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

JENAM TECH, LLC

Appellees

GOOGLE LLC

LG ELECTRONICS INC.

LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Appellee Attorney

Naveen Modi

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

2050 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/22/2021. [807905] Entry of Appearance is due on 11/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/08/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 11/08/2021. Certified List is due on 12/06/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 10/25/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naveen Modi